United States of America v. De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.C. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: David De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.C., David De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.A., David De La Garza, Jr., Katherine De La Garza, U.S. Bank, N.A., Bexar County Tax Assessor, Integras Capital Recovery LLC and Texas Workforce Commission
Claimant: Bexar County Hospital District, San Antonio River Authority, City of Helotes, Texas and Northside Independent School District
Case Number: 5:2022cv00969
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Filing 18 Defendants' Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Jaime Vasquez added to party Katherine De La Garza(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Vasquez added to party David De La Garza, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Vasquez added to party David De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.C.(pty:dft) by Katherine De La Garza, David De La Garza, Jr., David De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.C..(Vasquez, Jaime)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (nm)
October 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE Verified Claim of Bexar County, Texas by Bexar County Hospital District, Bexar County Tax Assessor, City of Helotes, Texas, Northside Independent School District, San Antonio River Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bird, Douglas)
October 18, 2022 Filing 15 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bexar County Hospital District, Bexar County Tax Assessor, City of Helotes, Texas, Northside Independent School District, San Antonio River Authority.(Bird, Douglas)
October 18, 2022 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties by Bexar County Tax Assessor, Bexar County Hospital District, San Antonio River Authority, City of Helotes, Texas, Northside Independent School District. (Bird, Douglas)
October 12, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022. (Orozco, Christian)
September 28, 2022 Filing 12 Acknowledgment of Service returned by United States of America. Bexar County Tax Assessor served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. (Orozco, Christian)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Integras Capital Recovery LLC. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
September 27, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Integras Capital Recovery, LLC by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Christian)
September 23, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to David De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.C.. Waiver sent on 9/8/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (Orozco, Christian)
September 23, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Katherine De La Garza. Waiver sent on 9/8/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (Orozco, Christian)
September 23, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to David De La Garza, Jr.. Waiver sent on 9/8/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. (Orozco, Christian)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Service returned by United States of America. Texas Workforce Commission served on 9/14/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Orozco, Christian)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam.
September 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (nm)
September 7, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm)
September 7, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (nm)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Orozco, Christian)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orozco, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.C.
Represented By: Jaime Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David De La Garza, Jr., D.D.S., P.A.
Represented By: Jaime Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David De La Garza, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine De La Garza
Represented By: Jaime Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County Tax Assessor
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integras Capital Recovery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Workforce Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christian A. Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County Hospital District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: San Antonio River Authority
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of Helotes, Texas
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Northside Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?