United States of America v. Trevino et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Luis Trevino, Haydee Gutierrez, Mercedes Martinez, Alicia Trevino, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Casey James Ltd., Cameron County Appraisal District, Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector and Borain Capital, LLC
Claimant: Cameron County, Texas, Brownsville Independent School District, South Texas Independent School District, City of Brownsville, Brownsville Navigation District, Cameron County Drainage District No. 1 and Texas Southmost College
Case Number: 5:2022cv01087
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Haydee Gutierrez. Waiver sent on 11/11/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Johns, Michelle)
November 14, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Mercedes Martinez. Waiver sent on 11/11/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Johns, Michelle)
November 14, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Alicia Trevino. Waiver sent on 11/11/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Johns, Michelle)
November 7, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Luis Trevino. Waiver sent on 11/4/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Johns, Michelle)
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Haydee Gutierrez, Mercedes Martinez, Alicia Trevino. (mgr)
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Haydee Gutierrez, #2 Summons to Mercedes Martinez, #3 Summons to Alicia Trevino)(Johns, Michelle)
October 26, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Hytken, Rachel)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 Waiver of Service filed by United States of America. Borain Capital, LLC (Johns, Michelle) Modified text on 10/25/2022 (wg).
October 25, 2022 Notice of Correction: Executed Summons filed in Error, Edited to Waiver of Service, re #12 Summons Returned Executed. (wg)
October 25, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: (wg)
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE Verified Claim of Cameron County, Texas et al. by Brownsville Independent School District, Brownsville Navigation District, Cameron County Drainage District No. 1, Cameron County, Texas, City of Brownsville, South Texas Independent School District, Texas Southmost College (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bird, Douglas)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 Original ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, . Attorney Douglas S. Bird added to party Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector(pty:dft) by Brownsville Independent School District, Brownsville Navigation District, Cameron County Drainage District No. 1, Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector, Cameron County, Texas, City of Brownsville, South Texas Independent School District, Texas Southmost College.(Bird, Douglas)
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by Cameron County, Texas, Brownsville Independent School District, South Texas Independent School District, City of Brownsville, Brownsville Navigation District, Cameron County Drainage District No. 1, Texas Southmost College. (Bird, Douglas)
October 21, 2022 Filing 8 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney William Lance Lewis added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank(pty:dft) by JP Morgan Chase Bank.(Lewis, William)
October 18, 2022 Filing 7 2nd AMENDED COMPLAINT against Borain Capital, LLC, Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector, Haydee Gutierrez, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Mercedes Martinez, Alicia Trevino, Luis Trevino amending #5 Amended Complaint., filed by United States of America.(wg)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint to Substitute Defendant, Borain Capital, LLC for Casey James, Ltd. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
October 17, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint Motion to Amend to Substitute Defendant, Borain Capital, LLC for Casey James, Ltd. by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Johns, Michelle)
October 7, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector, Casey James Ltd., Haydee Gutierrez, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Mercedes Martinez, Alicia Trevino, Luis Trevino amending #1 Complaint., filed by United States of America.(wg)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. JP Morgan Chase Bank served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Johns, Michelle)
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase Bank. (wg)
October 4, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 4, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. for JP Morgan Chase Bank (Johns, Michelle)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johns, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Trevino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle C. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haydee Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Rachel Lee Hytken
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey James Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron County Appraisal District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borain Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cameron County, Texas
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brownsville Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: South Texas Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of Brownsville
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brownsville Navigation District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cameron County Drainage District No. 1
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Texas Southmost College
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?