Classical Music Institute v. American Federation of Musicians - Local 23
Plaintiff: Donna Classical Music Institute and Classical Music Institute
Defendant: American Federation of Musicians - Local 23
Case Number: 5:2022cv01196
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 151 Labor: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 17 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 11/10/2022 and 11/14/2022, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Poage, Telephone number: (210)244-5036 Email: chris_poage@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/9/2022, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2022, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2023, (cp)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by Classical Music Institute. (mgr)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk's office is DIRECTED to administratively close this case pending further order of the Court. Though administratively closed, this case will still existon the docket of this Court and may be reopened upon request or on the Court's own motion. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fred Biery: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2022 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Classical Music Institute (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(mgr)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING #11 Motion to Quash Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
November 10, 2022 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fred Biery: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2022 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Classical Music Institute (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(wg)
November 9, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by American Federation of Musicians - Local 23. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C)(Holder, Matthew)
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE Amended Not of Issuance of Subpoena to R Oppenheim by Classical Music Institute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to R Oppenheim)(McElroy, Donna)
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by American Federation of Musicians - Local 23, re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Classical Music Institute DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Holder, Matthew)
November 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE Amended Not of Issuance of Subpoena to B Petkovich by Classical Music Institute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to B. Petkovich)(McElroy, Donna)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to B Petkovich by Classical Music Institute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to B. Petkovich)(McElroy, Donna)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Richard Oppenheim by Classical Music Institute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to R Oppenheim)(McElroy, Donna)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT Amended Cert of Service to Pltf's Mot for TRO - Dkt 2 by Classical Music Institute. (McElroy, Donna)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Gerald Holder on behalf of American Federation of Musicians - Local 23. Attorney Matthew Gerald Holder added to party American Federation of Musicians - Local 23(pty:dft) (Holder, Matthew)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ( Hearing set for 11/10/2022 9:30 AM before Judge Fred Biery,). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Classical Music Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L Meeker Dec, #2 Exhibit CMI Press Release, #3 Exhibit Montalvo Dec, #4 Exhibit Oppenheim Email, #5 Exhibit Milioto Dec, #6 Exhibit Oppenheim Ltr, #7 Exhibit Musician Resp to Oppenheim, #8 Exhibit Oppenhiem emails re CMI, #9 Exhibit Social Media Posts, #10 Exhibit SA Report article, #11 Proposed Order)(McElroy, Donna) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/2/2022) (wg).
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16709366). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Classical Music Institute. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McElroy, Donna) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/2/2022) (wg).
November 2, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
November 2, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Classical Music Institute v. American Federation of Musicians - Local 23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Classical Music Institute
Represented By: Donna K. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Classical Music Institute
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Preston
Represented By: Donna K. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of Musicians - Local 23
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?