Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C. v. United Services Automobile Association
Plaintiff: Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C.
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Case Number: 5:2022cv01201
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Whiting ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16873147) by on behalf of United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Whiting, Lauren)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wb)
November 29, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: United Services Automobile Association answer due 2/6/2023. (mgr)
November 29, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United Services Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Whiting, Lauren)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Docket Entry 9) entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Defendant's deadline to answer/respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to FEBRUARY 6, 2023. This is a text-only entry generated by the court. (wb)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C. to USAA EBA Group Medical Care Plan (O'Neil, Paul)
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C.. United Services Automobile Association served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (O'Neil, Paul) Modified on 11/17/2022, to edit text (mgr).
November 17, 2022 Set Deadlines: United Services Automobile Association answer due 12/6/2022. (mgr)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United Services Automobile Association. (mgr)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C.. (O'Neil, Paul)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Services Automobile Association. (mgr)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C.. (O'Neil, Paul)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16714666), filed by Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Neil, Paul)
November 3, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
November 3, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C. v. United Services Automobile Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windmill Wellness Ranch, L.L.C.
Represented By: Paul Matthew O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Lauren Whiting
Represented By: Michael E. Holzapfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?