Stephenson et al v. Rackspace Technology, Inc
Plaintiff: Garrett Stephenson and Gateway Recruiting, LLC
Defendant: Rackspace Technology, Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Chris Ondo, Q Industries, Inc., John Moser, David Lethe, Jake Vinson, VOIP Citadel, LLC and Richard Ackerman
Not Yet Classified: Dana Moser Wilkinson
Case Number: 5:2022cv01296
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation by Rackspace Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Marroquin, #2 Affidavit Declaration of J. Prewitt, #3 Proposed Order Defendant's Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration and Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Litigation)(Webb, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion for Entry of Case Management Order entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 30, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION Motion for Entry of Case Management Order #1 by Garrett Stephenson. (Cole, Scott)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER --As stated in open court at the status conference held on January 13, 2023, the deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Lethe Complaint is hereby extended to February 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
January 13, 2023 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 1/13/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(mgr)
January 10, 2023 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT to #16 Status Report by Garrett Stephenson. (Cole, Scott)
January 10, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Lethe, Rackspace Technology, Inc served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. . From case number 5:22-cv-1378 (Branscum, Debbie) Modified on 1/10/2023 TO edit text (bc).
January 10, 2023 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRIES WERE MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE EVENT NAME TO SUMMONS AND UPDATE THE SERVICE AND ANSWER DUE DATES.*** re #18 Certificate of Service, #17 Certificate of Service. (bc)
January 9, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Ondo, Rackspace Technology, Inc served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. . From case number 5:22-cv-1306 (Ellis, Jon) Modified on 1/10/2023 To edit text (bc).
January 3, 2023 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement by Garrett Stephenson. (Cole, Scott)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Stephenson and Ondo Plaintiffs' Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint and to the Q Industries Plaintiffs' Complaint is hereby extended until February 2, 2023. If Defendant's initial response is a motion or other filing that requires or permits responsive briefing, (1) Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to such motion shall be extended by fifteen (15) days, thereby allowing Plaintiffs a total of twenty-nine (29) days to respond to Defendants initial responsive filing, and (2) Defendant's deadline to file a reply shall be extended by seven (7) days, thereby allowing Defendant a total of fourteen (14) days following Plaintiffs' response to file a reply in support of its motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 29, 2022 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule (Agreed) by Rackspace Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order regarding Amended Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant's Responsive Pleading and Proposed Briefing Schedule)(Webb, Jeffrey)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER --The Court hereby ORDERS that SA-22-CV-01378-XR be consolidated into the lead case, SA-22-CV-01296-XR, which was first filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings be filed in SA-22-CV-01296-XR. Given these circumstances, the Court concludes that SA-22-CV-01378-XR is appropriate for administrative closure. See Mire v. Full Spectrum Lending, Inc., 389 F.3d 163, 167 (5th Cir. 2014). The Clerks Office is therefore DIRECTED to administratively close SA-22-CV-01378-XR pending further order of the Court.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE--For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion to consolidate and motion to appoint interimclass counsel filed in SA-22-CV-01322-XR (ECF No. 8) is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court hereby ORDERS that SA-22-CV-01322-XR be consolidated into the lead case, SA-22-CV-01296-XR, which was first filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings be filed in SA-22-CV-01296-XR. ( Status Conference set for 1/13/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Proposed Briefing Schedule by Rackspace Technology, Inc. (O'Donnell, Michael)
December 13, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rackspace Technology, Inc amending, filed by Garrett Stephenson, Gateway Recruiting, LLC.(Cole, Scott)
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garrett Stephenson, Gateway Recruiting, LLC. Rackspace Technology, Inc served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Bolce, Cody)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER--The Court hereby ORDERS that SA-22-CV-01306-XR be consolidated into the lead case, SA-22-CV-01296-XR, which was first filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings be filed in SA-22-CV-01296-XR. Given these circumstances, the Court concludes that SA-22-CV-01306-XR is appropriatefor administrative closure. See Mire v. Full Spectrum Lending, Inc., 389 F.3d 163, 167 (5th Cir. 2014). The Clerks Office is therefore DIRECTED to administratively close SA-22-CV-01306-XR pending further order of the Court.It is further ORDERED that Scott Edward Cole of Cole & Van Note shall be appointed interim lead counsel for the consolidated cases; and Jon Ellis of Sadovsky & Ellis, PLLC shall be appointed liaison counsel for the consolidated cases. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/14/2022) (mgr).
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Plaintiffs motion to consolidate and motion to appoint interim class counsel filed in SA-22-CV-01296-XR (ECF No. 5) is hereby GRANTED. The Court hereby ORDERS that SA-22-CV-00989-XR be consolidated into the lead case, SA-22-CV-00624-XR, which was first filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all futurefilings be filed in SA-22-CV-00624-XR Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cb)
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Edward Cole on behalf of Laura Van Note ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16845158) by on behalf of Garrett Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rackspace Technology, Inc. (mgr)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Order Granting Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel by Gateway Recruiting, LLC, Garrett Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Scott E. Cole, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Ronald W. Armstrong, II, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jon B. Ellis, #4 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Ronald)
December 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald W. Armstrong, II on behalf of Cody Alexander Bolce ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16833975) by on behalf of Gateway Recruiting, LLC, Garrett Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Ronald)
December 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald W. Armstrong, II on behalf of Scott Edward Cole ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16833973) by on behalf of Gateway Recruiting, LLC, Garrett Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Ronald)
December 5, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
December 5, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gateway Recruiting, LLC, Garrett Stephenson. (Armstrong, Ronald)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16815419), filed by Garrett Stephenson, Gateway Recruiting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Armstrong, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson et al v. Rackspace Technology, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Stephenson
Represented By: Ronald W. Armstrong, II
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway Recruiting, LLC
Represented By: Ronald W. Armstrong, II
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackspace Technology, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chris Ondo
Represented By: Jon Byron Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Q Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Javier Luis Herrera
Represented By: Jorge A. Herrera
Represented By: Laura E. Gutierrez Tamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Moser
Represented By: Frank Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Javier Luis Herrera
Represented By: Jorge A. Herrera
Represented By: Laura E. Gutierrez Tamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Lethe
Represented By: Debbie Branscum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jake Vinson
Represented By: Debbie Branscum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: VOIP Citadel, LLC
Represented By: Debbie Branscum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Ackerman
Represented By: Debbie Branscum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Dana Moser Wilkinson
Represented By: Frank Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Javier Luis Herrera
Represented By: Laura E. Gutierrez Tamez
Represented By: Jorge A. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?