McGlothlin v. Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stanley E. McGlothlin
Defendant: Benefits for Corporate America, Inc., Benefit Strategies Group, LLC and Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. Deferred Compensation Plan
Case Number: 5:2023cv00234
Filed: February 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER--the Court ORDERS McGlothlin to move for default judgment against Defendants in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, no later than Thursday, May 4, 2023. Failure to do so may result in the Courts dismissal of McGlothlins claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (nm)
April 12, 2023 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Benefit Strategies Group, LLC, Benefits for Corporate America, Inc., Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. Deferred Compensation Plan (nm)
April 12, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Benefits for Corporate America, Inc., Benefit Strategies Group, LLC and Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. Deferred Compensation Plan by Stanley E. McGlothlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Johnson)(Johnson, David) Modified on 4/12/2023 to edit text (nm).
April 12, 2023 Notice of Correction:***CHANGED DOCUMENT FROM MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO MOTION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT*** re #9 MOTION for Clerk. (nm)
March 15, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanley E. McGlothlin Benefit Strategies #3 Summons Issued (Johnson, David)
March 15, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanley E. McGlothlin Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. #3 Summons Issued (Johnson, David)
March 15, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanley E. McGlothlin Benefits for Corporate Amercia, Inc. Deferred Compensation Plan #3 Summons Issued (Johnson, David)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
February 28, 2023 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to David H. Garza. (nm)
February 28, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Benefit Strategies Group, LLC, Benefits for Corporate America, Inc., Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. Deferred Compensation Plan. (nm)
February 27, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm)
February 27, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (nm)
February 27, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stanley E. McGlothlin. (Johnson, David)
February 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17130852), filed by Stanley E. McGlothlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlothlin v. Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley E. McGlothlin
Represented By: David F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits for Corporate America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Strategies Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits for Corporate America, Inc. Deferred Compensation Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?