VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP v. SLOAN et al
Plaintiff: VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP
Defendant: DON SLOAN, BOB WILLIAMS, NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE, ERNEST DEWINNE, REBECCA GIBSON, BRUCE HAYES, CONRAD STRIEGL, ANDREA KING, Melissa Checkovage and BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT
Case Number: 5:2023cv00461
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT (Bullock, Bradford)
May 26, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT, NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE, Melissa Checkovage, ERNEST DEWINNE, REBECCA GIBSON, BRUCE HAYES, ANDREA KING, DON SLOAN, CONRAD STRIEGL, BOB WILLIAMS, re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE, Defendant BRUCE HAYES, Defendant ERNEST DEWINNE, Defendant BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT, Defendant ANDREA KING, Defendant CONRAD STRIEGL, Defendant Melissa Checkovage, Defendant REBECCA GIBSON, Defendant DON SLOAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Bullock, Bradford)
May 19, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP, re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE, Defendant BRUCE HAYES, Defendant ERNEST DEWINNE, Defendant BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT, Defendant ANDREA KING, Defendant CONRAD STRIEGL, Defendant Melissa Checkovage, Defendant REBECCA GIBSON, Defendant DON SLOAN (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. DON SLOAN served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. BRUCE HAYES served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. REBECCA GIBSON served on 4/22/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE served on 4/20/2023, answer due 5/11/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. Melissa Checkovage served on 4/20/2023, answer due 5/11/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. ERNEST DEWINNE served on 4/20/2023, answer due 5/11/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. CONRAD STRIEGL served on 4/21/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. BOB WILLIAMS served on 4/24/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. ANDREA KING served on 4/21/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (Jones, Marvin)
May 8, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT, NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE, Melissa Checkovage, ERNEST DEWINNE, REBECCA GIBSON, BRUCE HAYES, ANDREA KING, DON SLOAN, CONRAD STRIEGL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Bullock, Bradford)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
April 17, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT, NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE, Melissa Checkovage, ERNEST DEWINNE, REBECCA GIBSON, BRUCE HAYES, ANDREA KING, DON SLOAN, CONRAD STRIEGL, BOB WILLIAMS. (mgr)
April 14, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
April 14, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr)
April 14, 2023 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. (Jones, Marvin)
April 14, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. (Jones, Marvin)
April 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17318843), filed by VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Willow Springs Location Map)(Jones, Marvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP v. SLOAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANDERPOOL MANAGEMENT, LP
Represented By: Marvin W. Jones
Represented By: C. Brantley Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON SLOAN
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB WILLIAMS
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL BOULTINGHOUSE
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST DEWINNE
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA GIBSON
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE HAYES
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONRAD STRIEGL
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA KING
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Checkovage
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT
Represented By: Arturo D. Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Eugene Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?