Ballesteros v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Oscar Ballesteros
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2023cv00554
Filed: May 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order order granting extension). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Tucker, Eric)
June 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric B Tucker on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Eric B Tucker added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft) (Tucker, Eric)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. It is further ORDERED that the Defendant Acting Commissioner of Social Security be given until August 2, 2023, to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
May 10, 2023 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security amending, filed by Oscar Ballesteros.(Olinsky, Howard)
May 2, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm)
May 2, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (nm)
May 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17386669). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Oscar Ballesteros. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinsky, Howard) ***NEF REGENERATED ON 5/3/2023 TO USAO AND SSA IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 3*** Modified on 5/3/2023 (nm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballesteros v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Ballesteros
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Eric B Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?