Davoren et al v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jabez Davoren, Aaron Bates, Shana Brooks and Marcus Kurns
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv00577
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING, ( Status Conference set for 7/27/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
June 23, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement by Aaron Bates, Shana Brooks, Jabez Davoren, Marcus Kurns. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen, #3 Exhibit A (Order, SSE v. Page), #4 Exhibit B (Order, Sizemore-Easter v. Amazon))(Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 Sealed Document filed (wg)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk's Office is directed to file ECF No. 12-1 under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (szlc)
June 14, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, Ian)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (szlc)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (szlc)
June 8, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher K. Ramsey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17535258) by on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Ramsey, Christopher)
June 8, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie L. Sweitzer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17534733) by on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
June 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ian A. Wright on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. Attorney Ian A. Wright added to party Amazon Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ian A. Wright added to party Amazon.Com, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wright, Ian)
June 5, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marcus Kurns, Jabez Davoren, Shana Brooks, Aaron Bates as to All Defendants. (Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (szlc)
May 8, 2023 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to attorney, Ryan Allen Hancock. (wg)
May 8, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexandra K. Piazza for Michaela L. Wallin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17412826) by on behalf of Aaron Bates, Shana Brooks, Jabez Davoren, Marcus Kurns. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piazza, Alexandra)
May 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra K. Piazza on behalf of Aaron Bates, Shana Brooks, Jabez Davoren, Marcus Kurns (Piazza, Alexandra)
May 8, 2023 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to atty: Krysten Connon. (wg)
May 8, 2023 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to atty: Ryan Allen Hancock. (wg)
May 8, 2023 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter to atty: Michaela Wallin. (wg)
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17406292). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Marcus Kurns, Jabez Davoren, Shana Brooks, Aaron Bates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
May 5, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
May 5, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davoren et al v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabez Davoren
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Alexandra K. Piazza
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Bates
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Represented By: Alexandra K. Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Brooks
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Alexandra K. Piazza
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Kurns
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Alexandra K. Piazza
Represented By: Michaela L. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: Christopher K. Ramsey
Represented By: Ian A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: Christopher K. Ramsey
Represented By: Ian A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?