Duderstadt et al v. TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Duderstadt and Thais DeMoraes
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Intervenor Defendant: TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2023cv00724
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
July 21, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryobi Technologies, Inc. amending, filed by Dennis Duderstadt, Thais DeMoraes.(Wyatt, Paula)
July 20, 2023 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer: Pretrial Conference held on 7/20/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(tm2)
July 20, 2023 ORAL MOTION for leave to Amend.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (tm2)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion for leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (tm2)
July 19, 2023 Filing 20 TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.'s ANSWER to #14 Intervenor Complaint by Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc..(Faucett, Kaitlyn)
July 17, 2023 Filing 19 Scheduling Recommendations by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. (Faucett, Kaitlyn)
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. (Faucett, Kaitlyn)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is this Court's policy to require all counsel to apply for admission to the Western District's federal bar and to follow through with the application as a condition of appearance pro hac vice in any case. This Court, however, has made an exception for counsel if their practice in the District is limited to one case and, in limited circumstances, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney is involved in the case as co-counsel. Here, a licensed Western District of Texas attorney has been designated as co-counsel. Therefore, counsel may appear in this case pro hac vice without seeking admission to practice in the Western District of Texas, although counsel is free to seek and is encouraged to seek admission if that is desired. Any future appearance in the Western District of Texas will require that counsel apply for admission and be admitted into this District, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. The Court further ORDERS that counsel must become familiar with the Local Court Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, a copy of which may be obtained from the United States District Clerk for the Western District of Texas or from the Court's website. Finally, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel appearing pro hac vice, pursuant to Section 6 of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal Cases in the Western District of Texas, must register as a filing user within ten (10) days of this Order. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (MClc)
July 13, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J. Boteler on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Boteler, James)
July 10, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kaitlyn Michelle Faucett for Christopher C. Yearout ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17639218) by on behalf of Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Faucett, Kaitlyn)
June 28, 2023 Filing 15 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Boteler, James)
June 28, 2023 Filing 14 ALLSTATE VEHICLE & PROPERTY INSURANCE CO. Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(wg)
June 28, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Join by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Boteler, James)
June 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Chandler Bailey on behalf of Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Joel Chandler Bailey added to party Ryobi Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bailey, Joel)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw #4 Motion to Intervene. Allstate's #4 Motion to Intervene will be withdrawn. Allstate may re-file its Motion to Intervene in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (MClc)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company's Complaint in Intervention, attached as Exhibit 1 to the #13 motion, shall be placed on the docket. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (MClc)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order WITHDRAWING #4 Motion to Intervene in light of the text order granting the #11 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (MClc)
June 27, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #4 MOTION to Join by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Boteler, James)
June 23, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J. Boteler on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Boteler, James)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN PRETRIAL MATTERS, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/17/2023,, Initial Pretrial Conference set Via Zoom for 7/20/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
June 7, 2023 Filing 7 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. (Faucett, Kaitlyn)
June 6, 2023 Filing 4 ***WITHDRAWN PER GAVEL ORDER **** MOTION to Join by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Boteler, James) Modified on 6/28/2023 (wg).
June 5, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
June 5, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
June 5, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. (Faucett, Kaitlyn)
June 5, 2023 Filing 2 TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ryobi Technologies, Inc..(Faucett, Kaitlyn)
June 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryobi Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17517568), filed by Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Faucett, Kaitlyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duderstadt et al v. TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Duderstadt
Represented By: Louis Durbin
Represented By: Paula A. Wyatt
Represented By: Gavin H. McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thais DeMoraes
Represented By: Gavin H. McInnis
Represented By: Louis Durbin
Represented By: Paula A. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Michelle Faucett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: Kaitlyn Michelle Faucett
Represented By: Joel Chandler Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: James J. Boteler
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?