Smith v. Locker et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Smith
Defendant: Robert Locker, Guadalupe County, Hunter Saenz and Jimmy Gonzalez
Case Number: 5:2023cv00881
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - 42:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jimmy Gonzalez, Guadalupe County, Robert Locker, Hunter Saenz, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Robert Locker, Defendant Jimmy Gonzalez, Defendant Hunter Saenz, Defendant Guadalupe County (Magee, Jason)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (tm2)
August 23, 2023 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ronald Smith, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Robert Locker, Defendant Jimmy Gonzalez, Defendant Hunter Saenz, Defendant Guadalupe County Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cano, Andres)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ps)
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Jimmy Gonzalez, Guadalupe County, Robert Locker, Hunter Saenz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magee, Jason)
August 7, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jimmy Gonzalez, Guadalupe County, Robert Locker, Hunter Saenz amending, filed by Ronald Smith.(mgr)
August 7, 2023 Received (2) CDs marked as Exhibit D (Video). Forwarded (1) copy to OLG Chambers, placed (1) copy in file room. (mgr)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Guadalupe County, Hunter Saenz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magee, Jason)
July 24, 2023 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Jimmy Gonzalez, Robert Locker. (Magee, Jason)
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Jason Eric Magee added to party Jimmy Gonzalez(pty:dft) by Jimmy Gonzalez.(Magee, Jason)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Robert Locker. (Magee, Jason)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andres Roberto Cano ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17669215) by on behalf of Ronald Smith. (Cano, Andres)
July 17, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tm2)
July 17, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge elizabeth (tm2)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Locker (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17662655), filed by Robert Locker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Magee, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Locker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Smith
Represented By: Andres Roberto Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Locker
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Represented By: Susana Naranjo-Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe County
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Represented By: Susana Naranjo-Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Saenz
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Represented By: Susana Naranjo-Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Gonzalez
Represented By: Jason Eric Magee
Represented By: Susana Naranjo-Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?