Williams v. Ritenour et al
Plaintiff: John Bernard Williams, III
Defendant: John 'Bud' Ritenour, Jr. and Attorney General, Ken Paxton
Case Number: 5:2023cv01396
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Corrected Exhibits Document to ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John 'Bud' Ritenour, Jr.(Ritenour, John)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney John J. Ritenour, Jr added to party John 'Bud' Ritenour, Jr(pty:dft) by John 'Bud' Ritenour, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ritenour, John)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Bernard Williams, III. John 'Bud' Ritenour, Jr served on 11/7/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (mgr)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to John Bernard Williams, III. (dtg)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 3675), filed by John Bernard Williams, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
November 6, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (dtg)
November 6, 2023 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ritenour et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bernard Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 'Bud' Ritenour, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Ritenour, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General, Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?