Daoud v. Kolesnyk et al
Plaintiff: Alex Daoud
Defendant: Mykhailo Kolesnyk and Black Marlin Express Corp
Case Number: 5:2024cv00048
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Filing 20 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alex Daoud. (Tilton, Michael)
February 9, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE Defendants' Disclosure of Citizenship by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Goldman, Larry)
February 9, 2024 Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk. (Goldman, Larry)
February 9, 2024 Filing 17 Defendants First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk. (Goldman, Larry)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/29/2024,, Initial Pretrial Conference set Via Zoom for 4/4/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING re #9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Alex Daoud,. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 13 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND OTHER MATTERS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Plaintiff Alex Daoud, attorney John Papapavlou. (wg)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Plaintiff's Alex Daoud, attorney Porya Mostaghimi. (wg)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
January 11, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Alex Daoud. (Tilton, Michael)
January 10, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
January 10, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
January 10, 2024 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk. (Goldman, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE Notice of Related Litigation and Affected Non-Parties by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Goldman, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Entities with a Financial Interest in this Litigation by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Goldman, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Pary of Removal to Federal Court by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Goldman, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE Designation of Larry J. Goldman As Attorney in Charge by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Goldman, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Defendants' Notice of Counsel of Record by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Goldman, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party to Federal Court by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Goldman, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-18288328), filed by Black Marlin Express Corp, Mykhailo Kolesnyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Pltf. Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Court docs, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix Index for Removal)(Goldman, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daoud v. Kolesnyk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Daoud
Represented By: John Papapavlou
Represented By: Michael S. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mykhailo Kolesnyk
Represented By: Larry J. Goldman
Represented By: Paul Joseph Cataldo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Marlin Express Corp
Represented By: Larry J. Goldman
Represented By: Paul Joseph Cataldo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?