United States of America v. Jones, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS) and United States Of America
Defendant: Daniel L Jones, Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, VHS San Antonio Partners LLC, Bexar County Tax Assessor - Collector, Riverstone at Alamo Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper and VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC doing business as North Central Baptist Hospital
Claimant: Bexar County, Texas, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Alamo Community College District, University Health System, Northside Independent School District and Bexar County Emergency Services District #2
Case Number: 5:2024cv00285
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Of America. Daniel L Jones served on 4/6/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Sobotka, Andrew)
April 15, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Christopher Lee Trevino added to party Riverstone at Alamo Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc.(pty:dft) by Riverstone at Alamo Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc..(Trevino, Christopher)
April 12, 2024 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
April 12, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Matthew D. Durham added to party Nationstar Mortgage, LLC(pty:dft) by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.(Durham, Matthew)
April 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE Verified Claim of Bexar County, Texas, et al. by Alamo Community College District, Bexar County Emergency Services District #2, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Bexar County, Texas, Northside Independent School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bird, Douglas)
April 9, 2024 Filing 10 ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Douglas S. Bird added to party Bexar County Tax Assessor - Collector(pty:dft) by Alamo Community College District, Bexar County Emergency Services District #2, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Bexar County Tax Assessor - Collector, Bexar County, Texas, Northside Independent School District, University Health System.(Bird, Douglas)
April 9, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by Bexar County, Texas, Bexar County Road and Flood District, Alamo Community College District, University Health System, Northside Independent School District, Bexar County Emergency Services District #2. (Bird, Douglas)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Of America. Riverstone at Alamo Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc. served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Of America. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Of America. VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Of America. Bexar County Tax Assessor - Collector served on 3/21/2024, answer due 4/11/2024. (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
March 21, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bexar County Tax Assessor - Collector, Daniel L Jones, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Riverstone at Alamo Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc., VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC. (bt)
March 20, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bt)
March 20, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bt)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America (IRS). (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 405.), filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sobotka, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jones, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS)
Represented By: Andrew L. Sobotka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Andrew L. Sobotka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VHS San Antonio Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar County Tax Assessor - Collector
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverstone at Alamo Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Lee Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC doing business as North Central Baptist Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County, Texas
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County Road and Flood District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alamo Community College District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: University Health System
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Northside Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bexar County Emergency Services District #2
Represented By: Douglas S. Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?