Guzzetta v. Stolmeier et al
Plaintiff: Jerry A. Guzzetta
Defendant: Patrick J. Stolmeier and Stolmeier Law
Cross Defendant: Howard Grossman, Howard S Grossman, PA, George Spencer, Langley-Banack Incorporated, Ryan Anderson, Office of Ryan Anderson, PLLC, Carl Kolb, Carl Kolb, PC, Andrew Dhwadal, Lewis, Marenstein, Wicke, Sherwin and Lee, LLP, Jeffrey Tom and Law Offices of Jeff Tom, PC
Case Number: 5:2024cv00393
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Defense Base Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 32 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Patrick J. Stolmeier. (Stolmeier, Christopher)
June 5, 2024 Filing 31 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's amended complaint by Patrick J. Stolmeier. (Stolmeier, Christopher)
June 5, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Patrick J. Stolmeier, re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily and Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta (Stolmeier, Christopher)
June 3, 2024 Filing 29 DEFENDANT'S REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Stolmeier Law, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Counter Plaintiff Patrick J. Stolmeier (Stolmeier, Christopher)
May 31, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily and Without Prejudice by Jerry A. Guzzetta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tom, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2024 Filing 24 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jerry A. Guzzetta, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Counter Plaintiff Patrick J. Stolmeier, #10 MOTION to Join Required Third Parties filed by Defendant Patrick J. Stolmeier (Tom, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
May 30, 2024 Filing 27 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND OTHER MATTERS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
May 30, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE Vacation by Jerry A. Guzzetta (Kolb, Carl)
May 28, 2024 Filing 22 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Patrick J. Stolmeier Guzzetta's Amended Complaint in response to Stolmeier's FRCP 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss is still deficient. (Stolmeier, Christopher)
May 24, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Patrick J. Stolmeier, re #15 MOTION to find Stolmeier's 12b motions and answer were timely filed filed by Defendant Patrick J. Stolmeier (Stolmeier, Christopher)
May 24, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patrick J. Stolmeier, Stolmeier Law amending, filed by Jerry A. Guzzetta.(Kolb, Carl)
May 24, 2024 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jerry A. Guzzetta, re #15 MOTION to find Stolmeier's 12b motions and answer were timely filed filed by Defendant Patrick J. Stolmeier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Kolb, Carl)
May 23, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Parties by Patrick J. Stolmeier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 23, 2024 Filing 17 COMPLAINT Third Party Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18801533). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Patrick J. Stolmeier.(Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 17, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jerry A. Guzzetta, re #12 Opposed MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Join Required Third Parties, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, In the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Pacer Search Results, #2 Exhibit Western District Attorney Lookup Results, #3 Exhibit Conference Emails Notifying Stolmeier of the Order)(Tom, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to find Stolmeier's 12b motions and answer were timely filed by Patrick J. Stolmeier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 17, 2024 Filing 14 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Patrick J. Stolmeier of Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss. (Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 17, 2024 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Patrick J. Stolmeier, re #12 Opposed MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Join Required Third Parties, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, In the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta (Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 15, 2024 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Join Required Third Parties, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, In the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time by Jerry A. Guzzetta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tom, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2024 Filing 11 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM against Jerry A. Guzzetta by Patrick J. Stolmeier.(Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 10, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Join Required Third Parties by Patrick J. Stolmeier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Joinder Order)(Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 10, 2024 Filing 9 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Patrick J. Stolmeier . (Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Patrick J. Stolmeier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 12b1 Motion to Dismiss Order, #2 Proposed Order 12b6 Motion to Dismiss Order)(Stolmeier, Patrick)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Jerry A. Guzzetta Intent to Amend Pursuant to the Standing Order. (Tom, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry A. Guzzetta. Patrick J. Stolmeier served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024; Stolmeier Law served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Tom, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2024 Filing 5 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Jerry A. Guzzetta. (Tom, Jeffrey)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Patrick J. Stolmeier, Stolmeier Law. (wg)
April 16, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
April 16, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jerry A. Guzzetta. on Patrick Stolmeier and Stolmeier Law (Kolb, Carl)
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18654833), filed by Jerry A. Guzzetta.(Kolb, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzzetta v. Stolmeier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry A. Guzzetta
Represented By: Carl Joseph Kolb
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Stolmeier
Represented By: Patrick J. Stolmeier
Represented By: Christopher Michael Stolmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stolmeier Law
Represented By: Christopher Michael Stolmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Howard Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Howard S Grossman, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: George Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Langley-Banack Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Ryan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Office of Ryan Anderson, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Carl Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Carl Kolb, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Andrew Dhwadal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Lewis, Marenstein, Wicke, Sherwin and Lee, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Jeffrey Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Law Offices of Jeff Tom, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?