United States of America v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronald B Williams, Mary Williams, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Amcap Mortgage, Ltd. d/b/a Gold Financial Services and AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd. doing business as Gold Financial Services
Case Number: 5:2024cv00428
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Mary Williams. Waiver sent on 4/25/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (May, Michael)
May 24, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Ronald B Williams. Waiver sent on 4/25/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (May, Michael)
May 15, 2024 Filing 9 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney William Lance Lewis added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Lewis, William)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING re #6 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant AmCap Mortgage, Ltd. from case filed by United States of America, AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd. terminated.. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (May, Michael)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant AmCap Mortgage, Ltd. from case by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disclaimer of Interest in Real Property, #2 Proposed Order)(May, Michael)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (bot1)
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amcap Mortgage, Ltd. d/b/a Gold Financial Services, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mary Williams, Ronald B Williams. (wg)
April 23, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
April 23, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Mary Williams, #2 Summons to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., #3 Summons to Amcap Mortgage, Ltd.)(May, Michael)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 405.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(May, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael W. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald B Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amcap Mortgage, Ltd. d/b/a Gold Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCAP Mortgage, Ltd. doing business as Gold Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?