Valero Marketing and Supply Company v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2024cv00431
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Excise Tax
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia for all proceedings. Judge Fred Biery no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
June 13, 2024 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Feinberg, Adam)
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. U.S. Attorney W.D. Tex. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt and Green Card)(Feinberg, Adam)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 4/25/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt and Green Card)(Feinberg, Adam)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASESASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (rqr)
April 24, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (rqr)
April 24, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr)
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Valero Marketing and Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Feinberg, Adam)
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. Summonses for DOJ, IRS, US Attorney (Feinberg, Adam)
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BTXWDC-18688768), filed by Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feinberg, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valero Marketing and Supply Company v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Adam P. Feinberg
Represented By: Andrew Lewis Howlett
Represented By: Robert John Kovacev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eduardo Rene Mendoza
Represented By: Jonathan L. Blacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?