Hernandez v. Baylor University Board of Regents et al
Plaintiff: Jasmin Hernandez
Defendant: Baylor University Board of Regents, Art Briles and Ian McCaw
Case Number: 6:2016cv00069
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Waco Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING 97 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 94 Motion for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party. Pursuant to the Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code, Tevin S. Elliott is hereby designated as a responsible third party with respect to Plaintiffs state-law claims. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING IN PART re 87 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent Baylor seeks an order quashing the Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Reagan Ramsower dated February 23, 2017, (Dkt. 87-2). With respect to Bay lors request for the entry of a protective order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jasmin Hernandez and Defendants Briles and McCaw file a response on or before March 10, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Baylor file its reply on or before March 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 76 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Baylor University Board of Regents et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor University Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Briles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian McCaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin Hernandez
Represented By: Ryan M. Cohen
Represented By: Susan E. Hutchison
Represented By: Alexander S. Zalkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?