Alvarez v. Department of the Army
Plaintiff: Gilberto Alvarez
Defendant: Department of the Army
Case Number: 6:2016cv00172
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Waco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 135 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING 126 Motion for New Trial. It is ORDERED Defendants Motions for New Trial and Remittitur are DENIED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 117 Motion for Attorney Fees. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs is GRANTED IN PART as modified by this Order. Specifically, the Court awards the following: 1. $126,770.00 in attorneys fees as described above; and 2. $4,223.65 in chargeable costs. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) Modified on 4/6/2020 (am).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING 31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (tb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Alvarez
Represented By: Colin Walsh
Represented By: Robert Joseph Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?