Doe 1 et al v. Baylor University
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5 and Jane Doe 6
Defendant: Baylor University
Case Number: 6:2016cv00173
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Waco Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Pepper Hamilton Work Product 795 and DENYING Baylor's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer in Jane Doe 11 v. Baylor University 815 . Baylor is ORDERED to produce the Pepper Hamilton work product in accordance with the terms of this Order and shall serve on Plaintiffs the new privilege log described in the Order, no later than July 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (jg3)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ORDER re 334 MOTION to Quash Second Subpoena filed by Jim Doaks, 514 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition MOTION for Protective Order from Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition filed by Jim Doaks. The C ourt GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Doaks Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Second Subpoena (Dkt. 334 ) and Doaks Objections, a Motion for Protection, andMotion to Quash the Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition (Dkt. 514 ). The Court ORDERS that Doak s hall produce all materials responsive to Plaintiffs Second Subpoena in accordance with the terms of this Order on or before June 3, 2020. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Doak shall appear for a deposition no later than July 31, 2020, or at such later date if mutually agreed upon by Doak and the parties to the case. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (am)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER GRANTING 782 Baylor's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Injunctive Relief and Punitive Damages Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jg3)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER GRANTING 328 Motion to Compel. No later than March 15, 2019, Pepper Hamilton is ORDERED to either (1) complete production in response to the subpoena and file a notice with this Court certifying that production to Plaintiffs is complete, or (2) file a motion with this Court detailing any objections to production and requesting specific relief. Additionally, the Court ADVISES all parties to avoid speculating about opposing counsels motivations, and instead brief the Court with factual i nformation and specific requested relief. The Court REMINDS the parties that a proposed order shall be filed with all nondispositive motions. W.D. Tex. Loc. R. CV-7(g). The Court will strike any non-dispositive motion filed after this date without an attached proposed order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb) Modified on 3/7/2019 to correct docket text (jg3).
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 93 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING 84 Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Baylor University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: James R. Dunnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: James R. Dunnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 3
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: James R. Dunnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 4
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: James R. Dunnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 5
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: James R. Dunnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 6
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: James R. Dunnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?