Match Group, LLC v. Bumble Trading Inc.
Plaintiff: Match Group, LLC
Defendant: Worldwide Vision Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Magic Lab Co. and Badoo Trading Ltd.
Counter Plaintiff: Bumble Trading Inc. and Bumble Holding, LTD
Cross Defendant: IAC/InteractiveCorp
Case Number: 6:2018cv00080
Filed: March 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Waco Office
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
2 Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #148 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 149 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 1-7-2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/29/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2020, (kd)
January 7, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Caplan on behalf of Frank Pietrantonio ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13040918) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 147 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2020. Case called for telephonic discovery hearing. Plaintiff's counsel discussed his position regardingdiscovery. Defendant spoke on their position. Court will permit the 3 requested depositions however hestates that they should be fairly short and if there are any issues during the deposition, counsel shouldcall to Court to intervene. There was discussion regarding the deposition of Mr. Diller. The Court saidthat Mr. Diller will not be deposed unless there was other information he has not been given. No furtherinformation was forthcoming. There was discussion on the Blackstone Agreement. The Court stated thatif the Blackstone Agreement can't be produced then it is very likely that this case may not go forward. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #146 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Caplan on behalf of Samuel K. Whitt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13038440) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER, Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
January 3, 2020 Filing 144 Sealed Document filed Match Group, LLC and IAC's Advisory Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (lad)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #143 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk's Office is directed to file Match Group, LLC and IAC's Advisory Correspondence andsupporting Declaration shall remain under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 143 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Ex. 1 - Advisory Correspondence, #2 Sealed Document Ex. A - Declaration of John F. Summers, #3 Proposed Order) (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #142 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
December 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #141 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
December 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #140 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus for Jacques Jordan Lamothe ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12962129) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
December 13, 2019 Filing 141 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus for Bo Bryan Jin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12962080) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
December 13, 2019 Filing 140 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus for Harrison J. Frahn IV ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12962047) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #139 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Caplan on behalf of Max A. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12926461) by on behalf of Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc., Worldwide Vision Limited. (Caplan, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 138 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 10-29-19, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/16/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2020, (kd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 137 SUPPLEMENT to #130 Sealed Document, Redacted Public Version by Match Group, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #136 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 136 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Drayton on behalf of Judd D. Lauter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12828384) by on behalf of Bumble Trading Inc.. (Drayton, Joseph)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GOVERNING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #134 Motion entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came for consideration is Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Match Group, LLC, Cross-Defendant IAC/InterActiveCorp and Defendants Bumble Trading, Inc., Bumble Holding, Ltd., Badoo Trading Limited, Badoo Limited, and Badoo Technologies Limited's Motion for Entry of an Agreed Order Governing Electronically Stored Information. Because it is a joint motion, the Court GRANTS the motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 134 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Governing Electronically Stored Information by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ESI Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2019 re #116 and #128 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Case called for Motion Hearing. Counsel for both sides answered questions that the Court posed on each motion as well as made a presentation regarding their claims. The Court heard all argument and an Order will be forthcoming (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING re #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., Set Motion Hearing for #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(2), #116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint (Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
October 22, 2019 Filing 131 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd., re #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Defendant Badoo Technologies Limited, Defendant Badoo Software Limited, Defendant Badoo Limited, Defendant Badoo Trading Ltd. (Drayton, Joseph)
October 16, 2019 Filing 130 Sealed Document filed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P) (mc5)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #129 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Match Group, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Seal its Response and Accompanying Exhibits. After considering the motion, the Court concludes that the Motion should be GRANTED. It is therefore Ordered that Match Group, LLCs Response and its accompanying exhibits shall remain under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 129 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1 - Response, #2 Declaration of John F. Summers, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Sealed Document Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Sealed Document Exhibit M, #16 Sealed Document Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Proposed Order) (Caldwell, Bradley)
October 8, 2019 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(2) by Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited, Badoo Trading Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Idan Wallichman iso Badoo Trading Limiteds Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Vladimir Kornilovski iso Badoo Limiteds Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Vladimir Kornilovski iso Badoo Technology Limiteds Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Luke Frendo iso Badoo Software Limiteds Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint)(Drayton, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Worldwide Vision Limited, re #121 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff Match Group, LLC, #116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Worldwide Vision Limited (Drayton, Joseph)
October 2, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Motion and Exhibits by Match Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document, #2 Exhibit 1 - Response, #3 Declaration of John F. Summers, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Discovery Order Entered (ORDER GRANTING #122 Motion for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order) Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
September 30, 2019 Filing 124 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 9-17-19, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/21/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2019, (kd)
September 27, 2019 Filing 123 Sealed Document filed: Response to #116 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U) (lad)
September 27, 2019 Filing 122 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #121 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk's Office is directed to file the Motion and Exhibits under seal. Match is ORDERED to file redacted copies of the Motion and Exhibits by or on October 4, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 26, 2019 Filing 121 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1 - Response, #2 Declaration of John F. Summers, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Sealed Document Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Sealed Document Exhibit J, #13 Sealed Document Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Sealed Document Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Proposed Order) (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 20, 2019 Notice of Correction: Gavel order ruling on #116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint on 9/20/2019 was entered in error and has been removed from the docket. (kc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 120 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Match Group, LLC. Badoo Limited served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2019 Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Match Group, LLC. Badoo Trading Ltd. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #118 Motion to Unseal Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Unseal the Courts Order Denying Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Match Group, LLC and Counter-Defendant IAC/Interactive Corp.s Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims [Dkt. No. 98]. After considering the motion, the Court concludes that the Motion should be GRANTED. The clerk is directed to unseal Dkt. No. 98. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document #98 Sealed Order by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #108 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Strike Under Rule 12(f), Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint. As ordered during the telephonic hearing held on September 17, 2019, and for the reasons described therein, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion. But the Court notes that if Defendants wish to drop the claims that relate to Plaintiff's requested declaratory relief, Defendants must first request the Court's leave before doing so. The Court also notes that Plaintiff properly filed its Fourth Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #106 Motion to Substitute entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute Service. As ordered during the telephonic hearing held on September 17, 2019, and for the reasons described therein, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion. The Court notes that nothing in this order shall be construed as Defendants' counsel willingly accepting service for the newly added parties, but rather that Defendants' counsel only do so because of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 117 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for telephonic motion hearing. Parties discussed the pending motion to dismiss and after hearing evidence the Court decided to GRANT the motion. The Court further heard discussion regarding the substitute service issue. The Court ordered that the Defendant lawyers accept service for the two entities, and he notes that it is under duress. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint by Worldwide Vision Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Drayton, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING for 9/17/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
August 30, 2019 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc., re #108 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Strike Under Rule 12(f), Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bumble Holding, LTD, Defendant Bumble Trading Inc. (Caplan, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Match Group, LLC, re #106 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Service filed by Plaintiff Match Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 28, 2019 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Match Group, LLC. Worldwide Vision Limited served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 111 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Match Group, LLC, re #108 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Strike Under Rule 12(f), Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bumble Holding, LTD, Defendant Bumble Trading Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 110 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc., re #106 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Service filed by Plaintiff Match Group, LLC (Drayton, Joseph)
August 16, 2019 Filing 109 ANSWER to #100 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint by Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc..(Drayton, Joseph)
August 16, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Strike Under Rule 12(f), Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint by Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Drayton, Joseph)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MARKMAN CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
August 14, 2019 Filing 106 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Service by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 105 Summons Issued as to Worldwide Vision Limited. (lad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 104 Summons Issued as to Badoo Limited. (lad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 103 Summons Issued as to Badoo Trading Ltd. (lad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 102 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Match Group, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 101 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Match Group, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 100 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff Match Group LLC's Fourth Amended Complaint against Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc., Badoo Trading Ltd., Magic Lab Co., Worldwide Vision Limited, Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, Badoo Technologies Limited amending, filed by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 10, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to #66 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC.(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT MATCH GROUP, LLC AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT IAC/INTERACTIVE CORP.'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) Unsealed per Text Order dated 9/18/2019 (lad).
June 18, 2019 Filing 97 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 7, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Markman/Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/9/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019, (lr)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #95 Motion entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court entered the Parties proposed Joint Post-Markman Scheduling Order on June 17, 2019. Dkt. Number 96. Thus, the basis for the instant Motion is no longer present. Accordingly, the instant Motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2019, Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 4/24/2020, Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 14, 2019 Filing 95 Joint MOTION for Entry of Post-Markman Schedule by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 10, 2019 Filing 94 SUPPLEMENT to #90 Sealed Motion filed Redacted Public Version by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
June 7, 2019 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for Markman Hearing. Parties announce ready. Arguements made for terms. Court makes ruling regarding various terms. Parties also argue Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Match Group, LLC and Counter-Defendant IAC Interactive Corp's (dkt 80) Sealed Motion to Dismiss. Order will be issued early next week. Parties to look at May/June availability dates for a potential 2 week trial. Will have 8 jurors with 6 for a verdict. All 8 to deliberate. 4 strikes per side. Jury trial set for 07/20/20. Anticipated to last 2 weeks. Parties to submit a proposed scheduling order. Hearing concluded. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(lad)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING #90 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Match Group, LLC and IAC's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 3, 2019 Filing 91 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 5-28-19, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/24/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2019, (kd)
May 31, 2019 Filing 90 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1 - Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of John F. Summers, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Proposed Order) (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 29, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE Joint Claim Construction Statement of Disputed Claim Terms by Match Group, LLC (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 28, 2019 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 5/28/2019. Markman will be held on June 7. Court wants parties to provide audio regarding claims terms that are in dispute. Audio needs to be able to be downloaded in the cloud or mp3. Audio may be e-mailed to Lewis Tandy. At the Markman the Court wants someone to write down the claim construction and then give the document to the other side who shall review as to form only. Then the Court will issue an Order within 30 days or less (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad)
May 24, 2019 Filing 87 PLAINTIFF MATCH GROUP, LLCS REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Match Group, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 24, 2019 Filing 86 DEFENDANTS REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Bumble Holding, LTD. (Drayton, Joseph)
May 20, 2019 Filing 85 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc., re #80 Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Match Group, LLC, Cross Defendant IAC/InteractiveCorp (Drayton, Joseph)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/28/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
May 15, 2019 Filing 83 BRIEF by Bumble Holding, LTD, Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chris Schmandt, #2 Affidavit of Whelan, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14)(Drayton, Joseph)
May 15, 2019 Filing 82 BRIEF by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Declaration of Dr. Mark T. Jones)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 14, 2019 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENT to #80 Sealed Motion filed Redacted Public Version by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 2, 2019 Filing 80 PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT MATCH GROUP, LLC AND COUNTERDEFENDANT/IAC INTERACTIVECORPS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTSCOUNTERCLAIMS UNDER RULES 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(6), AND 12(f) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) Sealed per #79 Order.(lad)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING #78 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
May 1, 2019 Filing 78 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of John F. Summers, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit C, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Proposed Order) (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 26, 2019 Filing 77 BRIEF by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration of Dr. Mark T. Jones, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 26, 2019 Filing 76 BRIEF by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Chris Schmandt, #2 Affidavit of Rose Whelan, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Drayton, Joseph)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #74 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and Page Limits. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
April 23, 2019 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule and Page Limits by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #72 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
April 22, 2019 Filing 72 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING for 6/7/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING #69 Joint Motion to Modify Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (lad)
April 12, 2019 Filing 69 Joint MOTION to Modify the Protective Order by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 11, 2019 Filing 68 Summons Issued as to IAC/InteractiveCorp. (lad)
April 11, 2019 Filing 67 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bumble Trading Inc.. and Bumble Holding, Ltd. [Correction] (Caplan, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 66 DEFENDANTS BUMBLE TRADING INC. AND BUMBLE HOLDING, LTDS ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF MATCH GROUP, LLCS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CROSSCLAIMS AGAINST IAC/INTERACTIVECORP. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons)(lad)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #65 Bumble Trading Inc. and Bumble Holding, LTD's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims and Crossclaims entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, the Clerk's Office is directed to file Bumble's Answer to Match's Third Amended Complaint and Bumble's Proposed Counter and Cross Claims that is attached to Bumble's Motion as Exhibit A. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
April 10, 2019 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Match Group, LLCs Third Amended Complaint and Cross-claims Against IAC/InterActiveCorp by Bumble Holding, Ltd. and by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Caplan, Matthew)
March 27, 2019 Filing 64 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bumble Trading Inc. filed by Match Group, LLC, added to docket pursuant to #63 Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint.(lad)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
March 21, 2019 Filing 62 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Bumble Trading Inc., re #61 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Match Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Drayton, Joseph)
March 14, 2019 Filing 61 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #60 Defendant Bumble Trading, Inc's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Match Group, LLC's Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is therefore ORDERED that Bumble Trading, Inc's response (if any is required) to Match Group, LLC's Second Amended Complaint will be due 14 days after Match Group, LLC's motion seeking to amend its Second Amended Complaint in 18-CV-350 Dkt. 68, is resolved. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
March 8, 2019 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Match Group, LLC's Second Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caplan, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #54 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTING #58 Motion to Dismiss the '314 Patent claim against Defendant. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
March 5, 2019 Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Dismiss '314 Patent with Prejudice and to Grant Match Group, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #57 Plaintiff Match Group, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Bumble Trading, Inc.'s Counterclaims entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Match Group, LLC's Response to Bumble Trading, Inc.'s Counterclaims will be due 14 days after Bumble Trading, Inc. files its unopposed motion seeking to amend its counterclaims, as contemplated in 18-CV-350 Dkt. 68. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Bumble Trading Inc.'s Counterclaims by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Whelan, Rose)
February 19, 2019 Filing 54 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 15, 2019 Filing 53 AMENDED ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Match Group, LLC by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Drayton, Joseph)
January 25, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Match Group, LLC by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Drayton, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Dispute by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Bumble Trading Inc. answer to #10 Amended Complaint due 1/25/2019. (lad)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Noting the agreement of the parties, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant Bumble Trading shall have until January 25, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (md)
January 2, 2019 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. The new deadline to File Proposed Protective Order is 1/8/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
December 20, 2018 Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the '811 and '023 Patents on the Basis That Those Patents are Directed to Patent-Ineligible Subject Matter is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Trade Secret Claim is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Based on Statute of Limitations is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FINALLY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 45 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 12-10-18, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/4/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2019, (Davis, Kristie)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #41 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Status Conference held on 12/10/2018. Parties discussed pending motions. Court discussed and posed questions. Court determined that the fact discovery will be stayed until the Markman hearing with some exceptions. The Markman hearing will be May 23 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will issue an Order. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(jgb)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 12/10/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Enter Scheduling Order by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing set for 5/23/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2018 03:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
November 27, 2018 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. In accordance with the Court's Standing Order regarding the assignment of cases to the United States Magistrate Judge, the referral of the above-styled matter to the Honorable Jeffrey C. Manske, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Status Conference by Match Group, LLC re #27 Order, Set Hearings (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 13, 2018 Filing 36 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 11-5-18, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/4/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2019, (Davis, Kristie)
November 9, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority and Notice of Supplemental Materials to #34 Notice (Other), by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 8, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS MATCH GROUP, LLCS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Bumble Trading Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Drayton, Joseph)
November 5, 2018 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motions Hearing held on 11/5/2018. Defendant argued his motion and provided the Court and plaintiff with print out of their presentation. The Plaintiff argued their opposition of Defendant's motion and provided the Court and defendant with print out of their presentation. Court remembered that he had briefly represented Match many years ago. The defendant will confer with their client and let the Court know within 10 days if that will be a problem. The Court will deny the motion to dismiss the trade secrets. The Motion to Strike will be overruled however if 30b6 issue, plaintiff will provide witness and some documents may be requested. There is a conflict with the 12/18 status conference so the parties will confer and suggest alternate dates/times and the hrg may be held by phone. Judge spoke about the Markman hearing and parties are also to try to confer and get a date for that. Court will not issue until he knows from the plaintiff that he is not being requested to recuse himself. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(jgb)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
October 18, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bumble Trading Inc., re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Match Group First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bumble Trading Inc. (Drayton, Joseph)
October 11, 2018 Filing 30 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Match Group, LLC, re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Match Group First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bumble Trading Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F Part 1 of 5, #8 Exhibit F Part 2 of 5, #9 Exhibit F Part 3 of 5, #10 Exhibit F Part 4 of 5, #11 Exhibit F Part 5 of 5, #12 Exhibit G Part 1 of 2, #13 Exhibit G Part 2 of 2, #14 Exhibit H)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that the application of MICHAEL G. RHODES for admission pro hac vice ishereby GRANTED. If said attorney has not submitted the required fee concurrently with the filing of this application, that attorney shall immediately transmit the $100.00 fee to the Clerk of this Court for deposit into the Non-Appropriated Fund Account. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal cases in the Western District of Texas, attorneys admitted to practice pro hac vice must register as filing users within TEN (10) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED that the application of MATTHEW CAPLAN for admission pro hac vice is hereby GRANTED. If said attorney has not submitted the required fee concurrently with the filing of this application, that attorney shall immediately transmit the $100.00 fee to the Clerk of this Court for deposit into the Non-Appropriated Fund Account. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal cases in the Western District of Texas, attorneys admitted to practice pro hac vice must register as filing users within TEN (10) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb)
October 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/18/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Drayton on behalf of Matthew Caplan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11308466) by on behalf of Bumble Trading Inc... Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Drayton, Joseph)
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Drayton on behalf of Michael G. Rhodes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11307870) by on behalf of Bumble Trading Inc... Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Drayton, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 24 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Drayton, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Match Group First Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Drayton, Joseph)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb)
August 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bumble Trading Inc. answer due 9/30/2018. (tb)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Having considered the Motion and the grounds therefor, the Court GRANTS Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendants deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond is extended to September 30, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc)
August 29, 2018 Filing 21 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Drayton, Joseph)
July 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bumble Trading Inc. answer due 8/31/2018. (tb)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Having considered the Motion and the grounds therefor, the Court GRANTS Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Defendants deadline to file an answer or responsive motion is extended to August 31, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Drayton, Joseph)
June 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bumble Trading Inc. answer due 7/31/2018. (tb)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Having considered the Motion and the grounds therefor, the Court GRANTS Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Defendants deadline is extended to July 31, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc)
June 28, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Drayton, Joseph)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Court has considered Defendants Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, and is of the opinion that the Motion should be GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Theodore Stevenson III and Steven D. Wolens, shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Bumble Trading Inc. in this action, and shall have no further responsibilities or obligations herein. It is further ORDERED that Joseph Drayton, Rose Whelan, Deron R. Dacus, shall be substituted as counsel for Defendant Bumble Trading Inc.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc)
May 31, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Stevenson, Theodore)
May 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bumble Trading Inc. answer due 6/30/2018. (tb)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Having considered the Motion and the grounds therefor, the Court GRANTS Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Defendants deadline to respond is extended to June 30, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc)
May 29, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Drayton, Joseph)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rose S. Whelan for Bumble Trading Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph M. Drayton for Bumble Trading Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb)
May 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bumble Trading Inc. answer due 6/6/2018. (tb)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Court GRANTS the motion and extends the date for Defendant to file an answer or responsive motion to June 6, 2018.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JCM)
May 3, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Bumble Trading Inc.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Bumble Trading Inc.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron)
May 3, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Rose S.Whelan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10754945) by on behalf of Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dacus, Deron)
May 3, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Deron R Dacus on behalf of JOseph M. Drayton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10754912) by on behalf of Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dacus, Deron)
May 3, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dacus, Deron)
April 30, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff Match Group, LLC's First Amended Complaint against Bumble Trading Inc. amending, filed by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley W. Caldwell on behalf of Match Group, LLC. Attorney Bradley W. Caldwell added to party Match Group, LLC(pty:pla) (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Match Group, LLC. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Match Group, LLC(pty:pla) (Smith, Melissa)
March 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bumble Trading Inc. answer due 5/7/2018. (tb)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Having considered the Motion and the grounds therefor, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendants deadline to respond is May 7, 2018.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc)
March 27, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bumble Trading Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Stevenson, Theodore)
March 21, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Match Group, LLC. Bumble Trading Inc. served on 3/20/2018, answer due 4/10/2018. (Palmer, John)
March 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bumble Trading Inc. (tb)
March 19, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Match Group, LLC. (Palmer, John)
March 19, 2018 Filing 3 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jgb)
March 16, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb)
March 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jgb)
March 16, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Match Group, LLC. (Palmer, John)
March 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10579940). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Match Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Match Group, LLC v. Bumble Trading Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Bumble Trading Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Drayton
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Steven D. Wolens
Represented By: Rose S. Whelan
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew D. Caplan
Represented By: Jacques Jordan Lamothe
Represented By: Judd D. Lauter
Represented By: Bo Bryan Jin
Represented By: Max A. Bernstein
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Samuel K. Whitt
Represented By: Frank Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Bumble Holding, LTD
Represented By: Joseph M. Drayton
Represented By: Rose S. Whelan
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Jacques Jordan Lamothe
Represented By: Bo Bryan Jin
Represented By: Max A. Bernstein
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Samuel K. Whitt
Represented By: Frank Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Match Group, LLC
Represented By: John P. Palmer
Represented By: Warren J. McCarty, III
Represented By: Bradley W. Caldwell
Represented By: John F. Summers
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IAC/InteractiveCorp
Represented By: Bradley W. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Vision Limited
Represented By: Joseph M. Drayton
Represented By: Max A. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badoo Technologies Limited
Represented By: Joseph M. Drayton
Represented By: Jacques Jordan Lamothe
Represented By: Bo Bryan Jin
Represented By: Max A. Bernstein
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Samuel K. Whitt
Represented By: Frank Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badoo Limited
Represented By: Joseph M. Drayton
Represented By: Jacques Jordan Lamothe
Represented By: Bo Bryan Jin
Represented By: Max A. Bernstein
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Samuel K. Whitt
Represented By: Frank Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badoo Software Limited
Represented By: Joseph M. Drayton
Represented By: Jacques Jordan Lamothe
Represented By: Bo Bryan Jin
Represented By: Max A. Bernstein
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Samuel K. Whitt
Represented By: Frank Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Lab Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badoo Trading Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph M. Drayton
Represented By: Jacques Jordan Lamothe
Represented By: Bo Bryan Jin
Represented By: Max A. Bernstein
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Samuel K. Whitt
Represented By: Frank Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?