Ramos v. Swann

Plaintiff: Brandy Ramos
Defendant: Russell E. Swann, M.D., P.A.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00278
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2018. Parties have filed a proposed scheduling order. Court explained procedures and his expectations.When motions are ripe for rulings, please notify the Court so we can be responsive as quickly as possible. Parties had some questions regarding the oral motion submission (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(mc5)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order by Russell E. Swann, M.D., P.A.. (Myers, Angella)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/9/2018 11:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Angella Hebert Myers added to party Russell E. Swann, M.D., P.A. (pty:dft) by Russell E. Swann, M.D., P.A..(Myers, Angella)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Russell E. Swann, M.D., P.A. (tb)
September 20, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tb)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brandy Ramos. (Herrmann, Drew)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11250925), filed by Brandy Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrmann, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell E. Swann, M.D., P.A.
Represented By: Angella Hebert Myers
Represented By: Kathleen M. Cruz
Represented By: Janice S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Ramos
Represented By: Drew N. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?