American Patents LLC v. MediaTek, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: American Patents LLC
Defendant: NXP USA, Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Broadcom Corporation, NXP Semiconductors N.V., Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co. Ltd., MediaTek USA Inc., Qualcomm Technologies, Inc., NXP B.V., Qualcomm Incorporated, Broadcom PTE. Ltd. and MediaTek, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00339
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Qualcomm Incorporated and Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. answer due 2/10/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 9, 2019 Filing 29 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudgeons, Megan)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co. Ltd. and Lenovo Group Ltd. answer due 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric H. Findlay on behalf of Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co. Ltd., Lenovo Group Ltd.. Attorney Eric H. Findlay added to party Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co. Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric H. Findlay added to party Lenovo Group Ltd.(pty:dft) (Findlay, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 26 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Qualcomm Incorporated and Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. answer due 1/9/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Broadcom Corporation and Broadcom PTE. Ltd. answer due 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
December 7, 2018 Filing 23 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint as to Qualcomm Defendants by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
December 7, 2018 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint as to Broadcom Defendants by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; MediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek, Inc. answer or other response due on or before 2/5/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; NXP B.V., NXP Semiconductors N.V. and NXP USA, Inc. answer or other response due on or before 2/10/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
December 5, 2018 Filing 19 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Response to Plaintiff's Complaint as to NXP Defendants by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint as to Mediatek Defendants by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Qualcomm Incorporated. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to NXP USA, Inc. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to NXP Semiconductors N.V. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to NXP B.V. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to MediaTek USA Inc. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to MediaTek, Inc. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Lenovo Group Ltd. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co. Ltd. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Broadcom PTE. Ltd. (lad)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Broadcom Corporation. (lad)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Patents LLC. (Davis, Stafford)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Patents LLC. (Davis, Stafford)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (lad)
November 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mc5)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Patents LLC. (Davis, Stafford)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11454607). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Stafford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Patents LLC v. MediaTek, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Group Ltd.
Represented By: Eric H. Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcom Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP Semiconductors N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (Shanghai) Electronics Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Eric H. Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MediaTek USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Alter Hudgeons
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Megan Alter Hudgeons
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcom PTE. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MediaTek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Patents LLC
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Represented By: Michael D. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?