Fintiv, Inc. v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Fintiv, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00372
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #10 #11 #12 #13 #14 #15 #16 #17 #18 #19 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan K. Waldrop, Rodney R. Miller, Darcy L. Jones, John W. Downing, Marcus A. Barber, Daniel C. Miller, Jack Shaw, Heather S. Kim, Gurtej Singh for Fintiv, Inc., Travis Jensen for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Apple Inc. answer due 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 17, 2019 Filing 20 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received in the amount of $100, receipt number 600024221 for Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan K. Waldrop, Darcy L. Jones, Daniel C. Miller, Marcus A. Barber, John W. Downing, Rodney R. Miller, Heather S. Kim, Jack Shaw and Gurtej Singh. (mc5)
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Gurtej Singh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc.(klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Heather S. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Jack Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Daniel C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Marcus A. Barber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for John W. Downing to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Darcy L. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Jonathan K. Waldrop to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Rodney R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (klw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Claudia Wilson Frost [Travis Jensen] ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11646990) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fintiv, Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Mann, J.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fintiv, Inc.. (Mann, J.)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Fintiv, Inc. (Thompson, G.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (tb)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fintiv, Inc.. (Mann, J.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11584785), filed by Fintiv, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mann, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fintiv, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fintiv, Inc.
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Represented By: Andy W. Tindel
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: Craig D. Cherry
Represented By: Rodney R. Miller
Represented By: John W. Downing
Represented By: Heather S. Kim
Represented By: Jonathan K. Waldrop
Represented By: Jack Shaw
Represented By: Marcus A. Barber
Represented By: Gurtej Singh
Represented By: Darcy L. Jones
Represented By: Daniel C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Travis Jensen
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?