Aeritas, LLC v. Foot Locker, Inc.

Plaintiff: Aeritas, LLC
Defendant: Foot Locker, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00189
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Foot Locker, Inc. answer due 5/15/2019. (tb)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond is extended until and through May 15, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jw)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aeritas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Foot Locker, Inc. (lad)
March 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by Aeritas, LLC (Mort, Raymond)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aeritas, LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aeritas, LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11842182), filed by Aeritas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aeritas, LLC v. Foot Locker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aeritas, LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?