Mellgren v. American Resource Company et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Mellgren
Defendant: Terry Kollman, Steven Gallegos, John W Liatsis, American Resource Company and Dennis Pierce
Case Number: 6:2019cv00291
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ONDEFENDANT AMERICAN RESOURCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Motion for Substituted Service filed by Stephen Mellgren. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Howen, Stephen) Modified on 7/1/2019 (lad).
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to American Resource Company. (lad)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Steven Gallegos and Terry Kollmann by Stephen Mellgren (Attachments: #1 Affidavit as to service on Steven Gallegos, #2 Affidavit as to service on Terry Kollmann)(Howen, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2019 (lad).
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stephen Mellgren. Corrected (Howen, Stephen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #9 Request for Issuance of Summons (tb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stephen Mellgren. (Howen, Stephen)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to American Resource Company. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to American Resource Company. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Steven Gallegos. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Terry Kollman. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dennis Pierce. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John W Liatsis. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stephen Mellgren. (Howen, Stephen)
May 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee Paid $ 400. Receipt # 0542-12082515), filed by Stephen Mellgren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howen, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellgren v. American Resource Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Kollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Liatsis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Resource Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Mellgren
Represented By: Stephen D. Howen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?