Septent Financial, LLC v. Doggett

Plaintiff: Septent Financial, LLC
Defendant: Patrick J. Doggett
Case Number: 6:2019cv00298
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Septent Financial, LLC (Snell, Jason)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Septent Financial, LLC. Patrick J. Doggett served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Snell, Jason)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Patrick J. Doggett. (lad)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Septent Financial, LLC. (Snell, Jason)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12102655), filed by Septent Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Snell, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Septent Financial, LLC v. Doggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Septent Financial, LLC
Represented By: Jason W. Snell
Represented By: W. Lance Cawthon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Doggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?