Data Scape Limited v. Dell Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Defendant: Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc. and EMC Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00311
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in TXWD District, Austin Division as case number 1:19-CV-669. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TRANSFERING VENUE. ORDERED that the case be TRANSFERRED to the Austin Division but remain on the docket of United States District Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
July 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Defendants' deadline to file a response to the Complaint is EXTENDED to and including September 6, 2019. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to file a response to the Complaint is EXTENDED to and including September 6, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Transfer Venue to Austin Division by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vreeland, Cynthia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vreeland, Cynthia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shirley X.Li Cantin on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation. Attorney Shirley X.Li Cantin added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shirley X.Li Cantin added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shirley X.Li Cantin added to party EMC Corporation(pty:dft) (Cantin, Shirley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia D. Vreeland on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc., EMC Corporation. Attorney Cynthia D. Vreeland added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cynthia D. Vreeland added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cynthia D. Vreeland added to party EMC Corporation(pty:dft) (Vreeland, Cynthia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D. Ledahl on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Brian D. Ledahl added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Ledahl, Brian)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to EMC Corporation. (tb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Dell Technologies Inc. (tb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dell Inc. (tb)
May 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney C. Jay Chung added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Chung, C.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Kroeger on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Paul A. Kroeger added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Kroeger, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X. Wang on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Philip X. Wang added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Wang, Philip)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Data Scape Limited. (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases by Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Data Scape Limited. (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of AO 120 Report form by Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12133593), filed by Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Data Scape Limited v. Dell Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Paul A. Kroeger
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Represented By: C. Jay Chung
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Brian D. Ledahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Represented By: Shirley X.Li Cantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Represented By: Shirley X.Li Cantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Corporation
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Represented By: Shirley X.Li Cantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?