Data Scape Limited v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Defendant: Verizon Connect, Inc. and Verizon Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00312
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Verizon Connect, Inc. answer due 8/20/2019. (lad)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant Verizon Connect's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant Verizon Connect shall have until August 20, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by Verizon Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
June 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Verizon Connect, Inc. answer due 7/21/2019. (lt)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant Verizon Connect's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant Verizon Connect's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is July 21, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy W. Tindel on behalf of Verizon Connect, Inc.. Attorney Andy W. Tindel added to party Verizon Connect, Inc.(pty:dft) (Tindel, Andy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Verizon Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION As to Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. by Verizon Connect, Inc.. (Mann, J.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Verizon Connect, Inc.. Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Verizon Connect, Inc.(pty:dft) (Mann, J.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D. Ledahl on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Brian D. Ledahl added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Ledahl, Brian)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 Report on Patentsent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Reza Mirzaie and Brian D. Ledahl. (lad)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Verizon Connect, Inc. (lad)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (lad)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney C. Jay Chung added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Chung, C.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Kroeger on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Paul A. Kroeger added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Kroeger, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X. Wang on behalf of Data Scape Limited. Attorney Philip X. Wang added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Wang, Philip)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Data Scape Limited. (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases by Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Data Scape Limited. (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of AO 120 Patent Report form by Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12133608), filed by Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Data Scape Limited v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Paul A. Kroeger
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Represented By: C. Jay Chung
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Brian D. Ledahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Connect, Inc.
Represented By: Andy W. Tindel
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?