United Services Automobile Association (A Reciprocal Inter-Insurance Exchange) v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association (A Reciprocal Inter-Insurance Exchange)
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00328
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Atlas Van Lines, Inc. answer due 8/7/2019. (lad)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have until August 7, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by Atlas Van Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Henry, Vic)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #3 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. As Plaintiff filed an amended complaint, the instant motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdjm)
June 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Atlas Van Lines, Inc. amending, filed by United Services Automobile Association (A Reciprocal Inter-Insurance Exchange).(Clerkin, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United Services Automobile Association (A Reciprocal Inter-Insurance Exchange), re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support filed by Defendant Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Clerkin, Patrick)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Supplement to Notice of Removal by Atlas Van Lines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Docket Sheet)(Hubbard, Emileigh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support by Atlas Van Lines, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Henry, Vic)
May 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Atlas Van Lines, Inc.. (Henry, Vic)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12160556), filed by Atlas Van Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index for Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2A - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit 2B - Letter to Clerk to Reissue Citation, #5 Exhibit Citation to Atlas Van Lines, Inc., #6 Exhibit 2D - Return of Service for Atlas Van Lines, Inc., #7 Exhibit 3 - Bill of Lading, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Hubbard, Emileigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Services Automobile Association (A Reciprocal Inter-Insurance Exchange) v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association (A Reciprocal Inter-Insurance Exchange)
Represented By: Roxanna M. Robertson
Represented By: Patrick A. Clerkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?