Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd. v. Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd.
Defendant: Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00378
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC answer due 8/22/2019. (lad)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have until August 22, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Poposed Order)(Nash, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC answer due 8/8/2019. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have until August 8, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd.. Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Guaragna, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC. (lad)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd.. (Guaragna, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd.. (Guaragna, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12239739), filed by Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guaragna, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd. v. Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd.
Represented By: Aaron Fountain
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubicon Oilfield International Holdings LLC
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Represented By: Steven P. Tepera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?