Aeritas, LLC v. Panera Bread Company et al
Plaintiff: Aeritas, LLC
Defendant: Panera, LLC and Panera Bread Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00387
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Panera Bread Company and Panera, LLC answer due 9/16/2019. (lad)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The instant Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including September 16, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Panera Bread Company, Panera, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Brady)
July 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Panera Bread Company and Panera, LLC answer due 8/15/2019. (lad)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to August 15, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Panera Bread Company, Panera, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Brady)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Panera, LLC. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Panera Bread Company. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aeritas, LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aeritas, LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12265815), filed by Aeritas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aeritas, LLC v. Panera Bread Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aeritas, LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panera, LLC
Represented By: Brady Randall Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panera Bread Company
Represented By: Brady Randall Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?