Freshub, Inc. et al v. Amazon.Com Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Freshub, Ltd. and Freshub, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.Com Inc., Whole Foods Market Inc. and Prime Now, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00388
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Whole Foods Market Inc.. (Shelton, Barry)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.Com Inc., Prime Now, LLC. (Shelton, Barry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 Pro Hac Vice Letter to J. David Hadden, Saina S. Shamilov and Ravi R. Ranganath. (lad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Intra-District to Austin Division by Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.Com Inc., Prime Now, LLC, Whole Foods Market Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer Coleman, #2 Affidavit of Gerry D'Souza, #3 Affidavit of Tim Thompson, #4 Affidavit of Saina S. Shamilov, #5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov, #6 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov, #7 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov, #8 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov, #9 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov, #10 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Saina S. Shamilov, #11 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.Com Inc., Prime Now, LLC, Whole Foods Market Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
July 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.Com Inc., Prime Now, LLC and Whole Foods Market Inc. answer due 8/19/2019. (lad)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #14 #15 and #16 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Hannah, Lisa Kobialka, Paul J. Andre for Freshub, Inc. Freshub, Ltd. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendants' Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have until August 19, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.Com Inc., Prime Now, LLC, Whole Foods Market Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer for Paul J. Andre to represent Freshub, Inc. and Freshub, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12356245) by on behalf of Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) Modified on 7/17/2019 (lad).
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer for Lisa Kobialka to represent Freshub, Inc. and Freshub, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12356215) by on behalf of Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) Modified on 7/17/2019 (lad).
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer for James Hannah to represent Freshub, Inc. and Freshub, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12356164) by on behalf of Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) Modified on 7/17/2019 (lad).
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.Com Inc., Prime Now, LLC, Whole Foods Market Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Amazon Digital Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Amazon.Com Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Prime Now, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Whole Foods Market Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. Amazon.Com Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Palmer, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. Amazon Digital Services, LLC served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Palmer, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. Whole Foods Market Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Palmer, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. Prime Now, LLC served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Palmer, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Whole Foods Market Inc. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Prime Now, LLC. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amazon Digital Services, LLC. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com Inc. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. (Palmer, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. (Palmer, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12267080), filed by Freshub, Inc., Freshub, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freshub, Inc. et al v. Amazon.Com Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Digital Services, LLC
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Inc.
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Inc.
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Now, LLC
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshub, Ltd.
Represented By: John P. Palmer
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: James Hannah
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshub, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Palmer
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: James Hannah
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?