Unwired Asset Management LLC v. Callfire, Inc.
Plaintiff: Unwired Asset Management LLC
Counter Plaintiff: Callfire, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00390
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Callfire, Inc.. (Galvan, Hilda)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Hilda C. Galvan added to party Callfire, Inc.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Unwired Asset Management LLC by Callfire, Inc..(Galvan, Hilda)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard C. Weinblatt for Unwired Asset Management LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
July 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Callfire, Inc. answer due 8/21/2019. (lad)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Callfire, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond is EXTENDED until and including August 21, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12340321) by on behalf of Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Callfire, Inc. (lad)
June 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12270394), filed by Unwired Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unwired Asset Management LLC v. Callfire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Callfire, Inc.
Represented By: Hilda C. Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unwired Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Richard C. Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?