Ferguson, Jr. v. Davis
Petitioner: Hanson Ferguson, Jr.
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Case Number: 6:2019cv00423
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Lorie Davis answer due 9/26/2019. (lad)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The response is due on or before September 26, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to Answer by Lorie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanna, Cara)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter. (Attachments: #1 Privacy Policy)(lad)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hanson Ferguson, Jr. (lad)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Hanson Ferguson, Jr. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson, Jr. v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Cara Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hanson Ferguson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?