STC.UNM v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: STC.UNM
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00428
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez on behalf of Apple Inc. (Dominguez, Adrienne)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce S. Sostek on behalf of Apple Inc. (Sostek, Bruce)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Richard L. Wynne, Jr added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) by Apple Inc..(Wynne, Richard)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. extending answer due to 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 8/8/2019. Hearing set for a decision regarding question posed by counsel. Question regarding possible filing for extension of time for defendant to answer complaint. Court agreed that there should be an extension of 30 days Court asked the parties to confer regarding possible Markman date as soon as possible. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(bw)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Telephone Conference set for 8/8/2019 04:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STC.UNM. Apple Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (lad)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by STC.UNM. (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of STC.UNM. Attorney Robert Christopher Bunt added to party STC.UNM(pty:pla) (Bunt, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by STC.UNM. (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12368172), filed by STC.UNM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STC.UNM v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Massimo Ciccarelli
Represented By: Richard L. Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce S. Sostek
Represented By: Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STC.UNM
Represented By: Alfonso Garcia Chan
Represented By: Michael W. Shore
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: William D. Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?