Parus Holdings Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00432
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Apple Inc. Answer due 10/7/2019. (am)
August 22, 2019 Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if she has not already done so, shall immediately apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have until October 7, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rahebi, Bita)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Elizabeth Patterson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025404. (am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Patterson for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Matthew C. Callahan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025399. (am) (Main Document 19 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Rose S Lee. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025400. (am) (Main Document 18 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Hector G. Gallegos. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025401. (am) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Bita Rahebi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 600025398. (am) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew C. Callahan for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rose S. Lee for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hector G. Gallegos for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bita Rahebi for Apple Inc.. (am)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parus Holdings Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Fair, Andrea)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear for Tiffany M. Knapp to appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea L. Fair on Behalf of Tiffany M. Knapp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12393229) by on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (bw)
July 23, 2019 Notice of Correction: Request for Issuance of Summons #5 and #2 were filed with mistakes. Request for Issuance of Summons #6 is the correct document and therefore will be issued. (bw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12377647), filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,076,431, #3 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,451,084)(Ward, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parus Holdings Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Patterson
Represented By: Rose S. Lee
Represented By: Matthew C. Callahan
Represented By: Bita Rahebi
Represented By: Hector G. Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings Inc.
Represented By: T. John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: Tiffany M. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?