Parus Holdings Inc. v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings Inc.
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00433
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 35 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
December 20, 2019 **THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED INTO W19-CV-432. DO NOT FILE INTO THIS CASE** (mc5)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate 6:19-cv-00432, 6:19-cv-00433, 6:19-cv-00437, 6:19-cv-00438, and 6:19-cv-00454, where 6:19-cv-00432 is the lead case. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright. Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2019. Case called for Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Parties have agreed upon a full day Markman Hearing on August 21. The Court reviewed his normal Markman Hearing procedures. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(bw)
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. McNamara on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Michael J. McNamara added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (McNamara, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Renaud on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Michael Renaud added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Renaud, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:40 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
November 25, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE Defendant Google LLC's Reply in Support of Its Renewed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Indirect Infringement and Injunctive Relief to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google LLC's Renewed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support)(Amstutz, Paige)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 12/20/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
November 18, 2019 Filing 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google LLC's Renewed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Google LLC (Fair, Andrea)
November 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Readiness by Parus Holdings Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
November 4, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google LLC's Renewed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief by Google LLC. (McConnico, Stephen) motion orally granted at ECF No. 101 of the lead case (lad).
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristina R. Cary on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Kristina R. Cary added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Cary, Kristina)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #17 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant Google's Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Google filed a Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 23. Accordingly, the Court moots Google's Motion to Dismiss. Google may file a renewed Rule 12(b)(6) motion in response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Google LLC re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief (Amstutz, Paige)
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 ATTACHMENT to #20 Amended Complaint by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,076,431, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,451,084)(Fair, Andrea)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 Pro Hac Vice Letter. (am)
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC amending, filed by Parus Holdings Inc..(Fair, Andrea)
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Parus Holdings Inc., re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant Google LLC (Fair, Andrea)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Amstutz, Paige)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims of Willful Infringement, Induced Infringement, and Injunctive Relief by Google LLC. (Amstutz, Paige)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Daniel Silverman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12696528) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Luann L. Simmons ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12696516) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Darin W. Snyder ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12696489) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Mark Liang ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12696457) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Bill Trac ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12696302) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for David S. Almeling ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12695932) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
August 13, 2019 Set Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 10/7/2019. (am)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The instant Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant Google LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended until and including October 7, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McConnico, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parus Holdings Inc.. Google LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Fair, Andrea)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany M Knapp. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea L. Fair on Behalf of Tiffany M. Knapp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12393357) by on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (mc5)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Parus Holdings Inc.. Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Parus Holdings Inc.(pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Ward, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12377988), filed by Parus Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,076,431, #3 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,451,084)(Ward, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parus Holdings Inc. v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parus Holdings Inc.
Represented By: T. John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: Tiffany M. Knapp
Represented By: Michael Renaud
Represented By: Kristina R. Cary
Represented By: Michael J. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Bill Trac
Represented By: Darin W. Snyder
Represented By: Mark Liang
Represented By: Daniel Silverman
Represented By: David S. Almeling
Represented By: Luann L. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?