eCeipt LLC v. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Plaintiff: eCeipt LLC
Defendant: Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00470
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 13, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc. answer due 10/16/2019. (lad)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel for Michael W. Carwin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12606344) by on behalf of Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel for Richard L. Brophy ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12606267) by on behalf of Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 16, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc. (Ravel, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (mc5)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eCeipt LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12478688), filed by eCeipt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eCeipt LLC v. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Brophy
Represented By: Sven Stricker
Represented By: Michael W. Carwin
Represented By: J. Stephen Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eCeipt LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?