GPU++, LLC v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: GPU++, LLC
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated and Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00474
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines: Qualcomm Incorporated and Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. answer due 10/9/2019. (bw)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 9, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Qualcomm Incorporated, Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER - GPU++ v. Qualcomm Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint)(Porter, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GPU, LLC. Qualcomm Incorporated served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GPU, LLC. Qualcomm Technologies, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.. (bw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Qualcomm Incorporated. (bw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by GPU, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of GPU, LLC. Attorney Robert Christopher Bunt added to party GPU, LLC(pty:pla) (Bunt, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth (on behalf of Robert F. Kappers) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12487730) by on behalf of GPU, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth (on behalf of James R. Nuttall) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12487702) by on behalf of GPU, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by GPU, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GPU, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12486690), filed by GPU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GPU++, LLC v. Qualcomm Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher D. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPU++, LLC
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Robert F. Kappers
Represented By: James R. Nuttall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?