Al-Khawaldeh et al v. Tackett
Plaintiff: Ahmed Estate of Al-Khawaldeh, Fatima Al-Khawaldeh, Ali Mohammed Semreen Al-Khawaldeh and Fatima Souad Fanash Al-Khawaldeh
Defendant: Boyd "Skip" Tackett
Case Number: 6:2019cv00503
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Boyd "Skip" Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cunningham, Ross)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Donna J. Bowen (Bowen, Donna)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ali Mohammed Semreen Al-Khawaldeh, Fatima Souad Fanash Al-Khawaldeh, re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Fatima Souad Fanash Al-Khawaldeh, Plaintiff Ali Mohammed Semreen Al-Khawaldeh (Slack, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiffs' deadline to reply is now October 17, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Ali Mohammed Semreen Al-Khawaldeh, Fatima Souad Fanash Al-Khawaldeh.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Slack, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Boyd "Skip" Tackett, re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Fatima Souad Fanash Al-Khawaldeh, Plaintiff Ali Mohammed Semreen Al-Khawaldeh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tackett Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Tackett Declaration)(Cunningham, Ross)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #5 is now due October, 3, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Boyd "Skip" Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Cunningham, Ross)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ali Mohammed Semreen Al-Khawaldeh, Fatima Souad Fanash Al-Khawaldeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Slack, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f), Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
September 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boyd "Skip" Tackett.(Cunningham, Ross)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Boyd "Skip" Tackett. (Cunningham, Ross)
August 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boyd "Skip" Tackett (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12525958), filed by Boyd "Skip" Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Original Petition)(Cunningham, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Khawaldeh et al v. Tackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Estate of Al-Khawaldeh
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Al-Khawaldeh
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Mohammed Semreen Al-Khawaldeh
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Represented By: Donna J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Souad Fanash Al-Khawaldeh
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Represented By: Donna J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd "Skip" Tackett
Represented By: Alex Joseph Whitman
Represented By: Ross Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?