Galuppo et al v. Lone Star AG Credit
Plaintiff: Ronald Galuppo, Jr. and Rebecca Galuppo
Defendant: Lone Star AG Credit
Case Number: 6:2019cv00506
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lone Star AG Credit amending #1 Complaint, filed by Rebecca Galuppo, Ronald Galuppo, Jr.(bw)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Moot the Pending Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Clerk is hereby ordered to enter the attached Amended Complaint (ECF No. 10-1). It is further ordered that Defendant's Pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 5) is therefore MOOT, without prejudice to Defendant's right to refile a motion to dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Request to Deny the Pending Motion to Dismiss as Moot by Rebecca Galuppo, Ronald Galuppo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Burns, Warren)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal Under Rule 12(b)(6) entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Motion (ECF No. 5) is now on or before October 18, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Rebecca Galuppo, Ronald Galuppo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Burns, Warren)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f): Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2019 03:15 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lone Star AG Credit. (Weatherford, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lone Star AG Credit.(Weatherford, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Lone Star AG Credit. (Weatherford, Scott)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Galuppo, Ronald Galuppo, Jr. Lone Star AG Credit served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Burns, Warren)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lone Star AG Credit. (bw)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rebecca Galuppo, Ronald Galuppo, Jr. (Burns, Warren)
August 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12532260). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rebecca Galuppo, Ronald Galuppo, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burns, Warren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galuppo et al v. Lone Star AG Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star AG Credit
Represented By: Scott W. Weatherford
Represented By: Matt Dow
Represented By: Joshua A. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Galuppo, Jr.
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Galuppo
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?