Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00532
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing set for 4/24/2020 09:30 AM in Austin before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright. Telephone Conference held on 10/30/2019. Case called for telephonic scheduling conference. Parties had reached an agreed date for the Markman Hearing of April 24, 2020. The Court is available so Markman Hearing is set on 4/24/20 at 9:30 a.m. in Austin. Court briefly reviewed his Markman Hearing procedures and asked counsel to confer and reach an agreed scheduling order. Court answered any questions posed by counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(bw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Notice of Readiness for Initial Case Management Conference by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Davis, William)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 10/30/2019 10:20 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) by Apple Inc..(Guaragna, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Apple Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Davis, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Ty Wilson. (lad)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (am)
September 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Filing of Patent by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Davis, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Davis, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Davis, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12588647), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No 6,467,088, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: William E. Davis, III
Represented By: Debra Coleman
Represented By: Edward K. Chin
Represented By: Christian John Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?