Zeroclick, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zeroclick, LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00571
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. answer due 2/10/2020; LG Electronics, Inc. answer due 2/10/2020. (mc5)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendants to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have up to and including February 10, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Zeroclick, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ledahl, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zeroclick, LLC. LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Ledahl, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.. (am)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc.. (am)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am)
October 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Zeroclick, LLC. (Ledahl, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases by Zeroclick, LLC (Ledahl, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zeroclick, LLC. (Ledahl, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of AO 120 Report Form by Zeroclick, LLC (Ledahl, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12689303), filed by Zeroclick, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ledahl, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeroclick, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeroclick, LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Ledahl
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?