Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. BOK Financial
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Defendant: BOK Financial
Case Number: 6:2019cv00608
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul W. O'Finan (O'Finan, Paul)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BOK Financial.(Ravel, J.)
November 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines: BOK Financial answer due 11/14/2019. (lad)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant BOKF's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including November 14, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BOK Financial. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of BOK Financial. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party BOK Financial(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. BOK Financial served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BOK Financial. (lad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (O'Finan, Paul) Refiling with corrected case style (lad).
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12724543), filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Finan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. BOK Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOK Financial
Represented By: J. Stephen Ravel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Paul W. O'Finan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?