De La Vega v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Gabriel De La Vega
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00612
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Shelton, Barry)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Microsoft Corporation. (Shelton, Barry)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul W. O'Finan (O'Finan, Paul)
November 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Microsoft Corporation answer due 12/12/2019. (am)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including December 12, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 9, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
November 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation amending #1 Complaint., filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (am)
October 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12730415), filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Finan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Vega v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel De La Vega
Represented By: Paul W. O'Finan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?