De La Vega v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Gabriel De La Vega
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00614
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party International Business Machines Corporation(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.)
November 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth A. Young (Filing fee $100 receipt number 0542-12847832) for Nikhil Krishnan by on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Kenneth) Modified on 11/15/2019 to add receipt #(tr).
November 15, 2019 Reset Deadlines: International Business Machines Corporation answer due 12/20/2019. (lad)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. In light of Defendant's corrected filing of this motion at ECF No. 15, the Court MOOTS this motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including December 20, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul W. O'Finan (O'Finan, Paul)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth A. Young for Kristina N. Hendricks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12847814) by on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Kenneth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth A. Young for Bryan S. Hales, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12847791) by on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Kenneth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Respond to First Amended Complaint - Unopposed] by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Kenneth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth A. Young on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. Attorney Kenneth A. Young added to party International Business Machines Corporation(pty:dft) (Young, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (bw)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel De La Vega. Gabriel De La Vega served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corporation. (bw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corporation amending #1 Complaint., filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul) Corrected with #5 . Modified on 10/16/2019 (bw).
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12730760), filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Finan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Vega v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel De La Vega
Represented By: Paul W. O'Finan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Nikhil Rama Krishnan
Represented By: Kenneth A. Young
Represented By: J. Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Bryan S. Hales
Represented By: Kristina N. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?