Baxter et al v. Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tonya Baxter and Mathew Baxter
Defendant: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00616
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/31/2020. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 8/14/2020. Motions due by 2/14/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Came on this day to be considered the above matter. The Docket Control Conference in this matter is CANCELED AND WILL NOT BE RESET. The Court has reviewed the parties requested scheduling dates and will enter a scheduling order that accommodates those dates where possible; this order will be entered within the next 24-hours. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(De Los Santos, Eddy)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Docket Control Telephone Conference reset for 12/10/2019 03:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f), Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #2 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Counsel is directed to consult Local Rule AT-3: "An attorney seeking to withdraw from a case must file a motion specifying the reasons for withdrawal and providing the name and office address of the successor attorney. If the successor attorney is not known, the motion must set forth the clients name, address, and telephone number, and must bear either the clients signature or a detailed explanation why the clients signature could not be obtained after due diligence." In this case, counsel has not provided the Court with the clients' telephone number. Thus, counsel's motion is denied, without prejudice to counsel re-filing a later compliant motion seeking the same relief. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kara E. Pratt (Felber) for Mathew Baxter, Tonya Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
October 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
October 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Belfor USA Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12732482), filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(De Los Santos, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter et al v. Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Baxter
Represented By: Kara Ellen Felber
Represented By: Kara Ellen Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Baxter
Represented By: Kara Ellen Felber
Represented By: Kara Ellen Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Eddy L. De Los Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?