De La Vega v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Gabriel De La Vega
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00617
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FH Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - MPEP 711.03(c) (2015), #3 Exhibit C - MPEP 711.03(c) (2007))(Jones, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT Signature page to #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones Eric A. Krause ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12941617) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Jones, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones Eric A. Krause ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12941617) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones by Kevin X. McGann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12941594) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones by Scott D. Baker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12939166) by on behalf of Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul W. O'Finan (O'Finan, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 12/12/2019. (lad)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including December 12, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Patrick C. Clutter. (lad)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad)
October 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gabriel De La Vega. (O'Finan, Paul)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12733784), filed by Gabriel De La Vega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Finan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Vega v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel De La Vega
Represented By: Paul W. O'Finan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Represented By: Scott D. Baker
Represented By: Eric A. Krause
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?