TruSun Technologies, LLC et al v. Eaton Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John F Johnston, TruSun Technologies, LLC d/b/a TruSolis Technologies, The Johnston Family Trust, John F. Johnston and TruSun Technologies, LLC doing business as TruSolis Technologies
Defendant: Signify Holding B.V. and Cooper Lighting, LLC doing business as Cooper Lighting Solutions
Counter Plaintiff: Cooper Lighting, LLC and Eaton Corporation
Counter Defendant: TruSun Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00656
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to #43 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by TruSun Technologies, LLC.(Greene, Gilbert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 9/17/2020. Case called for Markman Hearing. Parties discussed claim terms that are at issue. The Defendants did not agree with some of the constructions and the Court reserved their right for objection on the record. The Court maintained it's preliminary constructions for the claim terms - plain and ordinary meaning. The Court and parties conferred and the Jury Trial date is set for January 10, 2022. Discovery can begin tomorrow morning. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(am)
September 14, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Craig Tyler on behalf of Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. Attorney M. Craig Tyler added to party Cooper Lighting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney M. Craig Tyler added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft) (Tyler, M.)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RESETTING ZOOM MARKMAN HEARING TIME for 9/17/2020 09:03 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
September 8, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Amy E. Simpson added to party Signify Holding B.V.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC by Eaton Corporation, Signify Holding B.V., Cooper Lighting, LLC.(Simpson, Amy)
August 15, 2020 Filing 42 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Signify Holding B.V. amending #15 Amended Complaint, filed by TruSun Technologies, LLC, John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust.(lad)
August 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #40 Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. The Court GRANTS the motion.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 41 STATUS REPORT -Joint Claim Construction Statement by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Simpson, Amy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-77)(Greene, Gilbert)
August 11, 2020 Filing 39 Received in Clerk's Office: copies of Defendants' Opening, Responsive and Reply Claim Construction Briefs. (lad)
August 10, 2020 Filing 38 Documents received via FedEx: Plaintiffs' Opening, Responsive and Reply Claim Construction Briefs. (lad)
August 6, 2020 Filing 37 BRIEF by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC. (Greene, Gilbert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 36 BRIEF by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Simpson, Amy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2020 re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. Case called for Motion Hearing on defendant's motions. The Court determined that, at this time, the motion(s) should be denied. The issue may be further argued in a motion for summary judgment, or be an issue at trial but should not be handled by the Court's ruling at this point in the case. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(lad)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING BY ZOOM for 7/29/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #10 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. In light of ECF No. 18, the Court MOOTS this motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 33 BRIEF by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC. (Greene, Gilbert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 32 BRIEF by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dr. Alfonso Ortega)(Simpson, Amy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 31 Thumbdrive received. (lad)
July 2, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amy Simpson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Affidavit of Dr. Alfonso Ortega, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H)(Simpson, Amy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 29 BRIEF by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Greene, Gilbert)
May 29, 2020 Filing 28 PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO #18 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC(lad)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Because good cause exists, the Court GRANTS the motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
May 28, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Skyler M. Howton for ADAM HESTER ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13611609) by on behalf of Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howton, Skyler)
April 28, 2020 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation, re #25 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff John F. Johnston, Plaintiff TruSun Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff The Johnston Family Trust -- DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY -- (Howton, Skyler)
April 22, 2020 Filing 25 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert)
April 15, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation, re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC, Defendant Eaton Corporation -- Defendants' Reply In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint -- (Howton, Skyler)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER. Markman Hearing set for 9/17/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
April 9, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order (Agreed) by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC. (Greene, Gilbert)
April 8, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC, re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC, Defendant Eaton Corporation (Greene, Gilbert)
March 26, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for telephonic scheduling conference. Parties discuss the possibility of extending the deadline and the timing with the Markman Hearing. The Court stated that the deadlines regarding additional discovery - if parties have not reached an agreement before the Markman Hearing then the issue will be brought up then. Markman Hearing agreed date September 17, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Court reviewed his Markman Hearing procedures. Defendants suggest that Eaton Corporation is no longer a party in this suit and they suggest it be removed by 12c or a Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court asked the counsel to let the Law Clerk know when the motion to dismiss is ripe so that the Court can issue an Order as quickly as possible. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kritsie Davis.)(am)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2020 02:15 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
March 25, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Redline of Complaint)(Howton, Skyler)
March 24, 2020 Filing 17 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua B. Long on behalf of John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC. Attorney Joshua B. Long added to party John F. Johnston(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua B. Long added to party The Johnston Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua B. Long added to party TruSun Technologies, LLC(pty:pla) (Long, Joshua)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by TruSun Technologies, LLC, John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 78)(Greene, Gilbert)
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Skyler M. Howton -- Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Terrence J. Wikberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13298505) by on behalf of Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Howton, Skyler)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE. Case is SET for a telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference on Thursday, March 26, 2020 at 4:15 p.m. before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
February 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Amy E. Simpson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13242584) by on behalf of Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Digital copy of #10 Motion to Dismiss received and placed in clerk's office secure storage. (lad)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Howton, Skyler)
January 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Stipulation filed by Cooper Lighting LLC and Eaton Corporation. Eaton Corporation and Cooper Lighting LLC answer due 2/20/2020. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time by Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Howton, Skyler)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TruSun Technologies, LLC, John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust. Cooper Lighting, LLC served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Greene, Gilbert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TruSun Technologies, LLC, John F. Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust. Eaton Corporation served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Greene, Gilbert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cooper Lighting, LLC. (am)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eaton Corporation. (am)
November 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by John F Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust, TruSun Technologies, LLC d/b/a TruSolis Technologies. (Greene, Gilbert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12831800), filed by TruSun Technologies, LLC d/b/a TruSolis Technologies, John F Johnston, The Johnston Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-64, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greene, Gilbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TruSun Technologies, LLC et al v. Eaton Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F Johnston
Represented By: Pierre Jean Hubert
Represented By: Jun Zheng
Represented By: Gilbert Andrew Greene
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Represented By: Diana M. Sangalli
Represented By: Thomas W. Sankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TruSun Technologies, LLC d/b/a TruSolis Technologies
Represented By: Pierre Jean Hubert
Represented By: Jun Zheng
Represented By: Gilbert Andrew Greene
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Represented By: Diana M. Sangalli
Represented By: Thomas W. Sankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Johnston Family Trust
Represented By: Pierre Jean Hubert
Represented By: Jun Zheng
Represented By: Gilbert Andrew Greene
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Represented By: Diana M. Sangalli
Represented By: Thomas W. Sankey
Represented By: Joshua B. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Johnston
Represented By: Pierre Jean Hubert
Represented By: Jun Zheng
Represented By: Gilbert Andrew Greene
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Represented By: Diana M. Sangalli
Represented By: Thomas W. Sankey
Represented By: Joshua B. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TruSun Technologies, LLC doing business as TruSolis Technologies
Represented By: Pierre Jean Hubert
Represented By: Jun Zheng
Represented By: Gilbert Andrew Greene
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Represented By: Diana M. Sangalli
Represented By: Thomas W. Sankey
Represented By: Joshua B. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Cooper Lighting, LLC
Represented By: Adam Hester
Represented By: M. Craig Tyler
Represented By: Skyler M. Howton
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: Terrence J. Wikberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Adam Hester
Represented By: M. Craig Tyler
Represented By: Skyler M. Howton
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: Terrence J. Wikberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signify Holding B.V.
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Lighting, LLC doing business as Cooper Lighting Solutions
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: M. Craig Tyler
Represented By: Skyler M. Howton
Represented By: Adam Hester
Represented By: Terrence J. Wikberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: TruSun Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Pierre Jean Hubert
Represented By: Jun Zheng
Represented By: Gilbert Andrew Greene
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Represented By: Diana M. Sangalli
Represented By: Thomas W. Sankey
Represented By: Joshua B. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?